This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/19/2022 at 02:06:38 (UTC).

Flores et al. v. Department of Transportation of the State of California

Case Summary

On 12/21/2020 Flores filed an Other lawsuit against Department of Transportation of the State of California. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Chalfant, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9918

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Chalfant, James

 

Party Details

Petitioners, Plaintiffs and Appellants

Angela Flores

Marysia Wojcik

Priscela Izquierdo

Respondent and Defendant

Department of Transportation of the State of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Christopher Sutton

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF CHRISTOPHER SUTTON

586 La Loma Rd.

Pasadena, CA 91105-2443

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Peter Andrew Ackeret

Attorney at CA Dept of Transportation

Po Box 1438

Sacramento, CA 95812-1438

Kirsten R. Bowman

Attorney at State of California-DOT

100 S Main St, Fl 13

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Erick L. Solares

Attorney at CalTrans

100 S Main St Ste 1300

Los Angeles, CA 90012-3727

Jerald Michael Montoya

Attorney at CalTrans/Legal Div

100 S Main St #1300

Los Angeles, CA 90012-3702

Erin Elise Mackey

Attorney at CA Dept of Transportation

Po Box 1438

Sacramento, CA 95812-1438

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/26/2022
  • HearingDescription: Cause to be submitted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Peter Ackeret, Counsel for Respondent ( 30 min)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Christopher Sutton counsel for appellant (30 min)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: This case is ordered on calendar for January 26, 2022 at 09:00 AM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Department of Transportation of the State of California Attorney: Peter Andrew Ackeret

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketBrief: Letter brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Department of Transportation of the State of CaliforniaAttorney: Peter Andrew Ackeret

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Angela Flores, Plaintiff and Appellant Christopher Sutton, Retained counsel Marysia Wojcik, Plaintiff and Appellant Christopher Sutton, Retained counsel Priscela Izquierdo, Plaintiff and Appellant Christopher Sutton, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Government Code letter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Original entry stricken - sequence no. not removed.; Notes: On 12/2/21 the Court requested additional Letter briefs

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: Volume 1 of 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Brief was due May 26, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Jan. 15, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Angela Flores Attorney: Christopher Sutton Plaintiff and Appellant: Marysia Wojcik Attorney: Christopher Sutton Plaintiff and Appellant: Priscela Izquierdo Attorney: Christopher Sutton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 paid via cc

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Angela FloresAttorney: Christopher Sutton Plaintiff and Appellant: Marysia WojcikAttorney: Christopher Sutton Plaintiff and Appellant: Priscela IzquierdoAttorney: Christopher Sutton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed Dec 21, 2020 by Angela Flores et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCP03681; Trial Court Judge: Chalfant, James

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SUTTON, CHRISTOPHER