This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/14/2023 at 02:05:16 (UTC).

Flippin v. Acuna

Case Summary

On 01/04/2023 Flippin filed an Other lawsuit against Acuna. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6972

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Ameer Flippin

San Francisco, CA 94109

Defendant and Respondent

Rocio Acuna

Not Yet Classified

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Paul W Lee

Attorney at Santa Barbara County Counsel

105 E Anapamu St Rm 201

Santa Barbara, CA 93101-6060

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2023
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Pursuant to appellant's request pursuant to CRC 8.500(f)(1), received service copy of document entitled: Notice of Petition for Review in the California Supreme Court of Order of Dismissal in Court of Appeals. - Not endorsed by Supreme Court. Proof of service also received - Note: No service on Supreme Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: A Petition for Review in the California Supreme Court should be filed with the California Supreme Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/21/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT: The untimely petition for rehearing is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Rehearing petition filed.; Notes: Duplicate submission

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Rehearing petition filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The court dismissed this appeal on January 31, 2023, because it was an appeal from a nonappealable order. On February 7, appellant filed an "Objection to Order of Dismissal in Court of Appeals" and asked the court to reconsider the dismissal. Because the motion does not establish that appellant appealed from an appealable order, the request is denied. The appeal remains dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Civil Case Information Statement incomplete: Missing judgment/order being appealed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/26/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ameer FlippinPro Per; Notes: Order being appealed attached

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/23/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Received service copy of appellant filing entitled: Request to amend designation to attach application for reimbursement of reporter's transcripts.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/19/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/18/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 01/04/2023 by Plaintiff Ameer Flippin in propria persona appealing order from 12/30/2022.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ameer Flippin Pro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Ameer FlippinPro Per

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CCH22585236

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less