This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/17/2023 at 08:01:11 (UTC).

Fleming v. Oliphant Financial, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/15/2022 Fleming filed an Other lawsuit against Oliphant Financial, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lucas, Patricia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5837

  • Filing Date:

    08/15/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lucas, Patricia

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Bruno Fleming

Appellant and Defendant

Oliphant Financial, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Matthew C. Salmonsen

Attorney at Consumer Law Center, Inc,

1435 Koll Circle, Suite 104

San Jose, CA 95112-4610

Frederick W. Schwinn

Attorney at Consumer Law Center, Inc.

38 West Santa Clara Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Raeon Rodrigo Roulston

Attorney at Consumer Law Center Inc

1435 Koll Circle, Suite 104

San Jose, CA 95112-4610

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Marcus M Dong

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck, LLP

425 California St Ste 2100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Katherine S. Catlos

Attorney at Kaufman Dolowich & Voluck LLP

425 California Street Suite 2100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Argument waived by: (no response - 10 day notice)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Oral argument waiver notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case on conference list.; Notes: 22-17

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed transferring case.; Notes: This matter (H049137) was transferred by Supreme Court Order on 08/09/2022 from the Sixth District to the First Appellate District.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Supreme Court order filed transferring case.; Notes: The following matters listed in Attachment 1 of this order, now pending in the Court of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District, are transferred to the First Appellate District: H047093 Dennis et al. v. Live Nation Worldwide, Inc. et al. H048883 GradeTech Inc. v. City of San Jose H048212 Fox v. Gerald C. Fox Foundation et al. H047317 Heidari v. North American Capacity Insurance Company et al. H049297 Moreno et al. v. Bertuccio et al. H048271 Contreras v. Yadav Enterprises, Inc. H049137 Fleming v. Oliphant Financial, LLC H049181 Garcia v. Santa Clara Valley Transportation Authority H048597 Darquea et al. v. Baev et al. H049383 A.H. et al. v. Labana H048917 A.H. et al. v. Labana H048897 Sterling Pacific Lending, Inc. v. Holman H047940 Spielbauer Law Office v. Midland Funding, LLC et al. H048148 Espinoza v. Warehouse Demo Services, Inc. H048213 Rossi v. Matheson H048131 Hoang v. Nguyen H047391 Shah v. Fidelity National Title Insurance Company H047220 WonderWorks PTE, LTD v. Hewlett Packard Company H049389 Heineke v. Santa Clara University et al. H048119 Heineke v. Santa Clara University

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Dear Mr. Navarrete, Pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 10.1000(a)(1)(C) and at the direction of the Administrative Presiding Justices of the First and Sixth Appellate Districts, I am requesting the transfer of the following matters to the First Appellate District. H047093 Dennis et al. v. Live Nation Worldwide, Inc. et al. H048883 GradeTech Inc. v. City of San Jose H048212 Fox v. Gerald C. Fox Foundation et al. H047317 Heidari v. North American Capacity Insurance Company et al. H049297 Moreno et al. v. Bertuccio et al. H048271 Contreras v. Yadav Enterprises, Inc. H049137 Fleming v. Oliphant Financial, LLC H049181 Garcia v. Santa Clara Valley Transportation Authority H048597 Darquea et al. v. Baev et al. H049383 A.H. et al. v. Labana H048917 A.H. et al. v. Labana H048897 Sterling Pacific Lending, Inc. v. Holman H047940 Spielbauer Law Office v. Midland Funding, LLC et al. H048148 Espinoza v. Warehouse Demo Services, Inc. H048213 Rossi v. Matheson H048131 Hoang v. Nguyen H047391 Shah v. Fidelity National Title Insurance Company H047220 WonderWorks PTE, LTD v. Hewlett Packard Company H049389 Heineke v. Santa Clara University et al. H048119 Heineke v. Santa Clara University The transfer of these matters is necessary to equalize the workload between districts and to ensure their timely resolution.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: 20CV363729; Trial Court Judge: Lucas, Patricia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Oliphant Financial, LLC Attorney: Marcus M Dong

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Oliphant Financial, LLCAttorney: Marcus M Dong

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: Reporter's transcript filed, AOB and appendix due in 40 days

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: RT-2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: Certificate of compliance

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Oliphant Financial, LLC Attorney: Marcus M Dong

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/04/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Oliphant Financial, LLCAttorney: Marcus M Dong

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court.; Notes: The $100 fee has not been deposited 8.1 00(b )(2).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Oliphant Financial, LLC Filed 5/14/21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where OLIPHANT FINANCIAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Marcus M Dong

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CATLOS, KATHERINE S.