This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/10/2023 at 08:05:12 (UTC).

F.L. v. The Superior Court; CFS

Case Summary

On 01/30/2023 F L filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court CFS. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alexander, Erin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0604

  • Filing Date:

    01/30/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Alexander, Erin

 

Party Details

Petitioner

F. L.

Respondent

The Superior Court of San Bernardino County

Interested Party

San Bernardino County Children and Family Services

Not Yet Classified

E. L.

Other

R. O.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Inez Tinoco-Vaca

Interested Party Attorney

Office Of The County Counsel

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Harold Gun Lai, Jr.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Order dismissing petition; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to letter filed Feb 22, 2023, by counsel for petitioner F.L., petition is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: No Issue Statement Filed by Counsel; Notes: Dtd Feb 22, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Record was filed this date. Writ petition due w/in 10 days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Juvenile writ record filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (111 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-2 (448 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Amended Clerk's Notice of Filing Notice of Intent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Amended Clerk's Notification of Filing Notice of Intent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute Order dtd Jan 30, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Jan 30, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: dtd Jan 30, 2023; F.L. (Father)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/30/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Bernardino County Superior Court; County: San Bernardino; Trial Court Case Number: J291448; Trial Court Judge: Alexander, Erin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less