This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/22/2023 at 02:00:57 (UTC).

Fitness International, LLC v. Andrews Rancho Del Sur

Case Summary

On 12/12/2022 Fitness International, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Andrews Rancho Del Sur. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dillon, Timothy. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5595

  • Filing Date:

    12/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Dillon, Timothy

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Fitness International, LLC

Defendant and Respondent

Andrews Rancho Del Sur

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorney

Dawn Britt Eyerly

Attorney at Freeman, Freeman & Smiley, LLP

1888 Century Park East Suite 1500

Los Angeles, CA 90067

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Gregory Joseph Ferruzzo

Attorney at Ferruzzo & Ferruzzo LLP

3737 Birch St Suite 400

Newport Beach, CA 92660

Sean Edward Morrissey

Attorney at Ferruzzo & Ferruzzo, LLP

3737 Birch St Ste 400

Newport Beach, CA 92660-2671

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/11/2023
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/28/2023
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Dec. 30, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Dec. 22, 2022: 8.122 w. RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Fitness International, LLC Attorney: Dawn Britt Eyerly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2023
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Fitness International, LLCAttorney: Dawn Britt Eyerly

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #32428638 for $775 from lasc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed December 12, 2022 by Fitness International, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/09/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCV43366; Trial Court Judge: Dillon, Timothy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less