This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 02/20/2022 at 22:06:04 (UTC).

First American Title Insurance Company v. Superior Court Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 First American Title Insurance Company filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lui, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3677

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lui, Christopher

 

Party Details

Petitioner

First American Title Insurance Company

Respondents

Superior Court Los Angeles County

Hon. Christopher K. Lui

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party

KWALA, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Christopher E. Deal

Attorney at Best Best & Krieger LLP

18101 Von Karman Ave, Ste 1000

Irvine, CA 92612

Kandice L. Kim

Attorney at Best Best & Krieger LLP

18101 Von Karman Ave Ste 1000

Irvine, CA 92612-164

Daniel Lee Richards

Attorney at Best Best & Krieger

18101 Von Karman Ave Ste 1000

Irvine, CA 92612-164

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Loren Nathan Cohen

Attorney at Tuchman & Associates

6080 West Pico Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90035

Michael Claudio DiCecca

Attorney at Aviv Tuchman

6080 West Pico Blvd

Los Angeles, CA 90035

Aviv L. Tuchman

Attorney at Tuchman & Associates

6080 West Pico Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90035

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: We have read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed on July 19, 2021. Petitioner has failed to demonstrate the superior court erred or that it is other otherwise entitled to extraordinary relief. Accordingly, the petition is denied.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Amended Volume 12 of 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Amended Volume 11 of 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Amended Volume 10 of 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Amended Volume 9 of 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Amended Volume 8 of 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Amended Volume 7 of 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Amended Volume 6 of 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Amended Volume 5 of 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Amended Volume 4 of 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Amended Volume 3 of 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Amended Volume 2 of 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Amended Volume 1 of 12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Something is due; see note.; Notes: Amended volumes 12 of 12 of exhibits.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volumes 12 of 12.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate with a stay.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where KWALA LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where First American Title Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Michael Claudio Dicecca