This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 10/28/2023 at 20:00:17 (UTC).

First Amendment Coalition et al. v. The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco

Case Summary

On 08/17/2022 First Amendment Coalition filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Karnow, Curtis. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***5888

  • Filing Date:

    08/17/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Karnow, Curtis

 

Party Details

Petitioners

First Amendment Coalition

KQED, Inc.

Respondent

The Superior Court of the City and County of San Francisco

Interested Parties

Rob Bonta

California Department of Justice

Other

Supreme Court of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Michael Temple Risher

David Edward Snyder

John David Loy

Thomas R. Burke

Sarah E. Burns

Interested Party Attorneys

Jennifer Elizabeth Rosenberg

Natasha A. Saggar Sheth

Mark Randolph Beckington

John Darrow Echeverria

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

07/03/2023

DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Monica N. Price no longer with First Amendment Coalition.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketDescription: Change of contact information filed for:; Notes: Davis Wright Tremaine LLP

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/05/2023

DocketDescription: Change of contact information filed for:; Notes: Thomas R. Burke old address 1: 505 Montgomery Street, Suite 800 new address 1: 50 California Street, 23rd Floor

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/23/2023

DocketDescription: Traverse to return filed.; Notes: Traverse of Plaintiffs/Petitioners

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/08/2023

DocketDescription: Written return filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023

DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Please take notice of the appearance of the following counsel of record for Real Parties in Interest Rob Bonta, in his official capacity as Attorney General of the State of California, and California Department of Justice: Natasha Saggar Sheth

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/08/2023

DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Natasha Saggar Sheth for RPI (PA)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/06/2023

DocketDescription: Issued order to show cause.; Notes: THE COURT: Good cause appearing from the petition for writ of mandate on file in this action, IT IS ORDERED that respondent superior court show cause, when the matter is ordered on calendar, why the relief requested in the petition should not be granted. Real party in interest must serve and file a return to the petition within 30 days of the issuance of this order to show cause. The reply to the return must be served and filed within 15 days after the filing of the return. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.487(b); rule references are to the Rules of Court.) In addition to any other issues the parties may wish to address, the court requests that the parties particularly focus on and address whether and to what extent Government Code section 11183 provides a basis for the California Department of Justice to withhold or redact records requested pursuant to Senate Bill No. 1421, including any legislative history relevant to this issue. The justices will be familiar with the facts and issues, will have conferred among themselves on the case, and will not require oral argument. If oral argument is requested, the request must be filed and served within 10 days of the date of this order. If no request for oral argument is filed on or before that date, the matter will be submitted at such time as the court approves the waiver and the time for filing all briefs and papers has expired. (Rule 8.256(d)(1).) If oral argument is requested, the court will notify the parties of the exact date and time set for oral argument, which will occur before Division Three of this court at the courtroom located on the fourth floor of the State Building, 350 McAllister Street, San Francisco, California. This order to show cause is to be filed and served on or before February 6, 2023. It shall be deemed served once the clerk of this court transmits certified copies of this order via TrueFiling to all parties to this proceeding and to respondent superior court. *fuj, pet, rod

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022

DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Vol 5 of 5 Pages 836-899

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/23/2022

DocketDescription: Reply filed to:

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/24/2022

DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: "REAL PARTIES' OPPOSITION TO PETITION FOR WRIT OF MANDATE"

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2022

DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: On or before October 24, 2022, real party in interest may serve and file an opposition, if any, to the above-captioned petition. Any reply shall be filed within thirty (30) days of the filing of the opposition.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/18/2022

DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid through Truefiling

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2022

DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2022

DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume IV; Pages 590 - 835

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2022

DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume III; Pages 296 - 589

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2022

DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume II; Pages 195 - 295

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2022

DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume I; Pages 1 - 194

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/17/2022

DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Petition for Writ of Mandate and Memorandum in Support Gov. Code section 6259 (Public Records Act Review)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2022

DocketTrial Court Name: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; County: San Francisco; Trial Court Case Number: CPF19516545; Trial Court Judge: Karnow, Curtis

[+] Read More [-] Read Less