This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/21/2021 at 00:12:22 (UTC).

Firsov v. Superior Court

Case Summary

On 08/14/2020 Firsov filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Manoukian, Socrates. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8352

  • Filing Date:

    08/14/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Manoukian, Socrates

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Sergey Firsov

Respondent

The Superior Court of Santa Clara County

Interested Parties

Luba Chernov

Yevgeniy Babichev

Ekaterina Berman

Omar Kitanoff

California Department of Justice

Kitanoff Group International

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorneys

Andrei Romanenko

Jeffrey Richard Vincent

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/20/2020

HearingDescription: Record purged - to be shipped to state records center.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2020

DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate and the request for stay are denied. (Elia, Acting P.J. and Grover, J. participated in this decision.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2020

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/21/2020

DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate and the request for stay are denied. (Elia, Acting P.J. and Grover, J. participated in this decision.)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2020

DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/25/2020

DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: No oppo filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/24/2020

DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Petition for writ of mandate

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/20/2020

DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/14/2020

DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate *Emergency Stay request

[+] Read More [-] Read Less