This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/10/2021 at 06:05:28 (UTC).

Firsov v. Babichev et al.

Case Summary

On 12/31/2019 Firsov filed an Other lawsuit against Babichev. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Sixth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Kulkarni, Sunil. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7713

  • Filing Date:

    12/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Kulkarni, Sunil

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Sergey Firsov

Defendants and Respondents

Omar Kitanoff

Kitanoff Group International

Ekaterina Berman

Luba Chernov

Yegeniy Babichev

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorney

Andrei Romanenko

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/06/2020

DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Notice of estimated costs, filed 9/28/20

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/30/2020

HearingDescription: Response to record prep. notice filed/received (civil).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/10/2020

DocketDescription: Record preparation inquiry sent.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2020

DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Appellant's designation, filed 1/24/20

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2020

DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Clerk's certificate of compliance, filed 2/10/20

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2020

DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Appellant's notice designating record (Amended) filed 2/4/20

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/05/2020

DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: Notice designating reporter's transcript is unclear. If 2a, page 1, is checked, you are requesting to proceed without Reporter's transcripts. Therefore 5a (1), page 3, should not be checked unless you are requesting Reporter's transcripts, Filed 1/29/20

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/14/2020

DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: The application for waiver of court fees and costs is granted only as to the filing fee due on the notice of appeal filed December 31, 2019.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2020

DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/13/2020

DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Appellant Sergey Firsov

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/02/2020

DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/02/2020

DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Sergey Firsov, filed 12/31/19

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
12/19/2019

DocketTrial Court Name: Santa Clara County Superior Court; County: Santa Clara; Trial Court Case Number: CV345499; Trial Court Judge: Kulkarni, Sunil

[+] Read More [-] Read Less