This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 08/12/2022 at 13:47:15 (UTC).

FIRSOV v. BABICHEV

Case Summary

On 10/23/2020 FIRSOV filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against BABICHEV. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4663

  • Filing Date:

    10/23/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Sergey Firsov

Respondents and Defendants

Omar Kitanoff

Kitanoff Group International

Ekaterina Berman

Yevgeniy Babichev

California Department of Justice

Luba Chernov

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Andrei Romanenko

Jeffrey Richard Vincent

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

11/24/2020

DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
11/24/2020

DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020

DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed; Notes: Sergey Firsov, Plaintiff and Appellant Pro Per

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020

DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available in electronic format.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/23/2020

DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Sergey Firsov Pro Per

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/08/2020

DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Supplemental proof of service reflecting service on the Superior Court and Attorney General's Office in Oakland.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/02/2020

DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Sergey Firsov Pro Per

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/22/2020

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Sixth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: H048209; Disposition: Other involuntary dismissal; Trial Court: Santa Clara County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: CV345499

[+] Read More [-] Read Less