This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/19/2022 at 05:32:48 (UTC).

Finkel Law Group v. Tempositions, Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 Finkel Law Group filed an Other lawsuit against Tempositions, Inc. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clay, C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3581

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Clay, C.

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Finkel Law Group

Respondents and Defendants

Tempositions, Inc.

On Call Counsel

Alan Tidwell

James Essey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Jonathan Herschel Bornstein

Attorney at Bornstein & Bornstein Law Group

2701 Telegraph Ave., Suite 200

Oakland, CA 94612

Lonnie Finkel

Attorney at Finkel Law Group, P. C.

1999 Harrison Street, Suite 1800

Oakland, CA 94612

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Alexander A. Graft

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

333 Bush Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Kendall Alexander Layne

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

333 Bush Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/04/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Email received from:; Notes: Jonathan Bornstein, attorney for appellant Finkel Law Group; dismissal has been filed in Alameda Superior Court; he will arrange to have copy sent to this court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: appendix with RT; RT is attached here

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: designation not in compliance with 8.130

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: amended designation Aug 20, designating appendix with RT attached (not attached)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 8/12/21, appendix with RT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: amended NOA by counsel for Finkel Group filed 7/22/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: by counsel for Finkel Law Group, filed 7/21/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Alameda; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG19004701; Trial Court Judge: Clay, C.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEMPOSITIONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Alexander A. Graft