This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 08/22/2021 at 09:17:50 (UTC).

Finkel Law Group P.C. v. Superior Court for the County of Alameda

Case Summary

On 01/19/2021 Finkel Law Group P C filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court for the County of Alameda. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Clay, C.. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1806

  • Filing Date:

    01/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Clay, C.

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Finkel Law Group P.C.

Respondent

Superior Court for the County of Alameda

Interested Parties

Tempositions, Inc.

Alan Tidwell

James A. Essey

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jonathan Herschel Bornstein

Attorney at Bornstein & Bornstein Law Group

2701 Telegraph Ave., Suite 200

Oakland, CA 94612

Lonnie Finkel

Attorney at Finkel Law Group, P.C.

1999 Harrison Street, Suite 1800

Oakland, CA 94612

Interested Party Attorney

Kendall Alexander Layne

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

333 Bush Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final BY THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate is denied. (Oceanside Union School Dist. v. Superior Court (1962) 58 Cal.2d 180, 185-186, fn. 4; Sav-On Drugs, Inc. v. Superior Court (1975) 15 Cal.3d 1, 5; Los Angeles Gay & Lesbian Center v. Superior Court (2011) 194 Cal.App.4th 288, 299-300; Volkswagen of America, Inc. v. Superior Court (2001) 94 Cal.App.4th 695, 701 [to the extent the petition is construed as challenging matters resolved in respondent's June 19, 2020 order]; Sherwood v. Superior Court (1979) 24 Cal.3d 183, 186-187; Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.486(b)(1)(C).) * Before Simons, Acting P.J., Needham, J. and Burns, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: BY THE COURT:* The petition for writ of mandate is denied. (Oceanside Union School Dist. v. Superior Court (1962) 58 Cal.2d 180, 185-186, fn. 4; Sav-On Drugs, Inc. v. Superior Court (1975) 15 Cal.3d 1, 5; Los Angeles Gay & Lesbian Center v. Superior Court (2011) 194 Cal.App.4th 288, 299-300; Volkswagen of America, Inc. v. Superior Court (2001) 94 Cal.App.4th 695, 701 [to the extent the petition is construed as challenging matters resolved in respondent's June 19, 2020 order]; Sherwood v. Superior Court (1979) 24 Cal.3d 183, 186-187; Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.486(b)(1)(C).) * Before Simons, Acting P.J., Needham, J. and Burns, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Corrected exhibits in support of petition, volume 1, pages 1-90

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 3 of 3, pages 259-381

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Corrected exhibits, volume 2, pages 91-258

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Corrected petition, from Bornstein & Bornstein, attorneys for Finkel Law Group

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Verification of petition, from Jonathan Bornstein and Lonnie Finkel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid through Truefiling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Volume 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Peremptory Writ of Mandate in the First Instance, or an Alternative Writ or Other Appropriate Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG19004701; Trial Court Judge: Clay, C.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TEMPOSITIONS, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court for the County of Alameda is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kendall Alexander Layne