This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 06/14/2022 at 22:10:15 (UTC).

FERRA v. GILMORE

Case Summary

On 10/26/2021 FERRA filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against GILMORE. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1484

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Maria Ferra

Defendants and Respondents

Christina Ferra Gilmore

Canary Asset Management, Inc.

C & H Trust Deed Service

Coby Halavais

Lake Forest, CA 92630-8315

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

David E. Rosen

Attorney at Murphy Rosen Meylan & Davitt LLP

100 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1300

Santa Monica, CA 90401

Blake Alexandra Rummel

Attorney at Weinstock Manion, ALC

1875 Century Park East, Suite 2000

Los Angeles, CA 90067-2501

Cynthia E. Tobisman

Attorney at Greines Martin Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036-3697

Alana H. Rotter

Attorney at Greines Martin Stein & Richland LLP

5900 Wilshire Boulevard, 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

W. Todd Stevenson

Attorney at Stevenson Law Office

15250 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 1102

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403-3223

Hannah Grace Elisha

Attorney at Stevenson Law Office

15250 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 1102

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Joseph S. Klapach

Attorney at Klapach & Klapach, P.C.

15303 Ventura Boulevard, Suite 1510

Sherman Oaks, CA 91403

Coby R. Halavais

Attorney at Halavais & Associates, APC

1 Orchard Road, Suite 110

Lake Forest, CA 92630-8315

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/22/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Maria Ferra Attorney: Cynthia E. Tobisman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Appellate record imported and available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Christina Ferra Gilmore Attorney: Joseph S. Klapach

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 5; Court of Appeal Case Number: B303592; Disposition: Reversed & Remanded to trial court w/directions; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BC722537

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CANARY ASSET MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where C & H TRUST DEED SERVICE is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HALAVAIS COBY RICHARD

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ELISHA HANNAH GRACE