This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/07/2022 at 21:15:02 (UTC).

FERNANDO v. S.C. (TENNIS)

Case Summary

On 10/04/2021 FERNANDO filed an Other lawsuit against C TENNIS. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1191

  • Filing Date:

    10/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Michael Justin Fernando

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

Brandon Tennis

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Anthony Sears

Attorney at Anthony A. Sears Attorney At Law

846 West Foothill Blvd., Suite M-1

Upland, CA 91786-3784

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorney

Nader Aaron Nader

Attorney at Law Offices of Nader A. Nader

14545 Friar St Ste 102

Van Nuys, CA 91411-2357

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/01/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received Court of Appeal record

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Michael Justin Fernando Attorney: Anthony Sears

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 3; Court of Appeal Case Number: B314413; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 21STUD01165; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BS175827

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer NADER NADER A