This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/05/2022 at 06:15:19 (UTC).

FCM Investments, LLC v. Grove Pham, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 04/19/2022 FCM Investments, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against Grove Pham, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Ottolia, Daniel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8876

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Ottolia, Daniel

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

FCM Investments, LLC

Appellants and Defendants

Phoung Pham

Trish Pham

Grove Pham, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorney

Richard Martin Foster

Attorney at Law Offices of Richard M. Foster

5429 Cahuenga Blvd

North Hollywood, CA 91601

Appellant and Defendant Attorney

Teri Thuy Pham

Attorney at Enenstein Pham & Glass

650 Town Center Drive, Suite 840

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned document for non-conformance.; Notes: stip-This case was transferred to Division 1, San Diego. Please file in Div. 1 with the correct case number.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Transferred to Court of Appeal; Disposition Type: Final Division 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case transferred to San Diego per Supreme Court order.; Notes: Rec'd order dated Aug 12, 2022; CRC 10.1000(a)(1)(D)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (7 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-6 (1568 Pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd June 10, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Settlement conference declined.; Notes: Declined by court, prebriefing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's SCIF received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's SCIF received.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Settlement notice sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: May 2, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/21/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Apr 19, 2022; Phoung Pham et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: RIC1902326; Trial Court Judge: Ottolia, Daniel

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GROVE PHAM LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PHAM TERI T. ESQ.