This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/15/2023 at 19:01:15 (UTC).

FC PIER 70 v. CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO

Case Summary

On 03/24/2023 FC PIER 70 filed an Other lawsuit against CITY AND COUNTY OF SAN FRANCISCO. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8853

  • Filing Date:

    03/24/2023

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

FC Pier 70, LLC

Respondent and Defendant

City and County of San Francisco

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Matthew S. Kahn

Blaine H. Evanson

Elizabeth Aislinn Dooley

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Sara J. Eisenberg

Molly J. Alarcon

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

04/26/2023

DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/26/2023

DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/24/2023

DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
03/01/2023

DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Defendant and Respondent: City and County of San Francisco Attorney: Sara J. Eisenberg The request for publication has been considered and is denied for the reason that the Court of Appeal does not find said opinion meets the criteria for publication as set forth in rule 8.1105(c).

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/02/2023

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. 5; Court of Appeal Case Number: A164411; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: San Francisco County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: CGC21589577

[+] Read More [-] Read Less