This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/04/2022 at 02:34:07 (UTC).

Fanning v. Worker's Compensation Appeals Board

Case Summary

On 11/29/2021 Fanning filed an Other lawsuit against Worker's Compensation Appeals Board. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6591

  • Filing Date:

    11/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Carey Fanning

Respondents

Worker's Compensation Appeals Board

San Francisco, CA 94142-9459

Zenith Insurance Co.

Gelsons Markets

Workers' Compensation Appeals Board

San Francisco, CA 94142-9459

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

David T. Holzman

Attorney at Hourigan, Holzman & Sprague, LLP

5951 Encina Road Suite 105

Goleta, CA 93117

Respondent Attorneys

Workers' Compensation Appeals Board

P.O. Box 429459

San Francisco, CA 94142-9459

Brent Ernest Levine

Attorney at Tobin Lucks

5425 Hollister Ave Ste 210

Santa Barbara, CA 93111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/14/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: [SEE ORDER] We deny the petition for writ of review.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition filed by:; Notes: Attorney D. Holzman for petitioner

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition filed by:; Notes: Attorny A. Fairchild for WCAB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: WCAB / Answer due within 25 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for a writ of review filed (WCAB).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Workers' Compensation Appeals Board; County: Santa Barbara; Trial Court Case Number: ADJ10862354

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Workers' Compensation Appeals Board; County: Santa Barbara; Trial Court Case Number: ADJ11931128

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Workers' Compensation Appeals Board; County: Santa Barbara; Trial Court Case Number: ADJ11931099

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ZENITH INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant