This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 11/09/2022 at 06:05:28 (UTC).

Fairly-Haze et al. v. Whitesails Community Association

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 Fairly-Haze filed an Other lawsuit against Whitesails Community Association. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 6 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Coats, Benjamin. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1574

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Coats, Benjamin

 

Party Details

Appellants and Petitioners

Robert Haze

Suzan L. Fairly-Haze

Respondent

Whitesails Community Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Petitioner Attorneys

Samuel J. Arsht

Attorney at Silver & Arsht

1860 Bridgegate Street, Ste. 100

Westlake Village, CA 91361-1409

Marsha Claire Brilliant

Attorney at Silver & Arsht

1860 Bridgegate St

Westlake Village, CA 91361-1405

Respondent Attorneys

Nicholas J. Wolfsen

Attorney at Law Office of Pamela Moore

1111 E Katella Ave Ste 200

Orange, CA 92867-5064

Pamela Abbott Moore

1111 E. Katella Ave. Suite 200

Orange, CA 92867-5064

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case fully briefed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's reply brief.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Suzan L. Fairly-Haze Attorney: Marsha Claire Brilliant Attorney: Samuel J. Arsht Petitioner and Appellant: Robert Haze

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's reply brief.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Suzan L. Fairly-HazeAttorney: Marsha Claire Brilliant Attorney: Samuel J. Arsht Petitioner and Appellant: Robert Haze

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's reply brief. Due on 08/23/2022 By 15 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's reply brief. Requested for 08/23/2022 By 15 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's reply brief. Due on 08/08/2022 By 61 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's brief.; Notes: Respondent: Whitesails Community Association Attorney: Pamela Abbott Moore

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/19/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Party Attorney: Respondent: Whitesails Community AssociationAttorney: Pamela Abbott Moore

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 05/18/2022 By 30 Day(s) RB extended to 5/18/2022 **No further extensions**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Respondent's brief. Requested for 05/18/2022 By 30 Day(s) request to extend time to file respondent's brief

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-6 (1392) Previously prepared certified R-1 (61)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of:; Notes: SERVICE copy of notice of rescinding default dated 6-18-2021 by VCSC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/11/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.122(c) clerk's fees not deposited. Dated:; Notes: dtd 6-10-21; to be cured 6-25-21

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 04-16-2021; CT and previously prepared certified RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Suzan L. Fairly-Haze Attorney: Samuel J. Arsht Petitioner and Appellant: Robert Haze Attorney: Samuel J. Arsht

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Suzan L. Fairly-HazeAttorney: Samuel J. Arsht Petitioner and Appellant: Robert HazeAttorney: Samuel J. Arsht

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: N/A filed 4-8-2021 challenging 2-26-2021 j/or

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/26/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Ventura County Superior Court - Main (Ventura); County: Ventura; Trial Court Case Number: 56-2019-00527637-CU-PA-VTA; Trial Court Judge: Coats, Benjamin

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Whitesails Community Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WOLFSEN NICHOLAS J.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE PAMELA ABBOTT