This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 05/03/2022 at 22:08:38 (UTC).

EXLINE v. GILLMOR

Case Summary

On 09/07/2021 EXLINE filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against GILLMOR. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0779

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Brian Exline

Respondent and Defendant

Lisa Gillmor

Other

The Superior Court of Santa Clara County

191 North First Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Elizabeth Marie Pipkin

Attorney at McManis Faulkner

Fairmont Plaza 50 West San Fernando Street, 10Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95113

Michael Reedy

Attorney at McMANIS FAULKNER

50 West Sanfernando Street, 10Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95113

James McManis

Attorney at McManis Faulkner

Fairmont Plaza 50 West San Fernando Street, 10Th Floor

San Jose, CA 95113

Christine Elizabeth Peek

Attorney at McManis Faulkner

Fairmont Plaza 10Th Floor 50 West San Fernando Street

San Jose, CA 95113

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Michael Cook Crosby

Attorney at Crosby & Crosby, PLC

1570 The Alameda, Suite 200

San Jose, CA 95126

Matthew Allen Crosby

Attorney at Crosby & Crosby, A Prof Law Corp

1570 The Alameda, Suite 200

San Jose, CA 95126

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including December 6, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Brian Exline Attorney: Michael Reedy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Lisa Gillmor Attorney: Michael Cook Crosby

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported electronically.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Brian Exline Attorney: Michael Reedy

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fourth Appellate District, Division Three; Court of Appeal Case Number: G060034; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Santa Clara County Superior Court - San Jose (Court 2); Trial Court Case Number: 18CV336922

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less