This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/06/2023 at 09:12:11 (UTC).

Evig, LLC v. The Superior Court of Napa County

Case Summary

On 01/13/2023 Evig, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Napa County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Smith, Cynthia. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***6951

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Smith, Cynthia

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Evig, LLC

Respondent

The Superior Court of Napa County

Interested Party

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Yosef Peretz

Attorney at Peretz & Associates

22 Battery Street, Suite 200

San Francisco, CA 94111

Interested Party Attorneys

Office of the Attorney General

455 Golden Gate Avenue - Suite 11000

San Francisco, CA 94102-7004

Christopher J Judge

Attorney at Santa Clara County DA's Office

70 West Hedding Street

San Jose, CA 95110-1705

Matthew Louis Beltramo

Attorney at Alameda County District Attorney's Office

1225 Fallon Street, Dept 9

Oakland, CA 94612

Jennifer Deng

Attorney at District Attorney Santa Clara County

70 W Hedding St

San Jose, CA 95110

Patrick Dennis Collins

Attorney at Napa County District Attorney

1127 1St St Ste C

Napa, CA 94559-2952

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/17/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final THE COURT: The petition for writ of mandate is denied. The request for a stay is denied. (Streeter, Acting P.J., Brown, J., and Whitman, J.*) * Judge of the Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT: The petition for writ of mandate is denied. The request for a stay is denied. (Streeter, Acting P.J., Brown, J., and Whitman, J.*) * Judge of the Superior Court of California, County of Alameda, assigned by the Chief Justice pursuant to article VI, section 6 of the California Constitution.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Real Party in Interest's Preliminary Opposition to Petition for Writ of Mandate and Request for Stay

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: For supplemental compendium of exhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Supplemental Compendium of Exhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: For petition and exhibits

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: TO ALL COUNSEL: This is Channing of Division 4. Please find attached a court order that was just filed. You are being served via this email, rather than via TrueFiling, which is not operational at this very moment. Petitioner needs to take action. Recognize the due date is 1.17.23 on or before 8 a.m. This is an official communication from the court. No other communication will follow. Thank you. Channing (Mr.) Channing Hoo Deputy Clerk, Division 4 California Court of Appeal, 1st District 415.865.7296

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate filed on January 13, 2023 does not include an adequate supporting record. Under the Rules of Court, rule 8.486, a writ petition must include "[a]ll documents and exhibits submitted to the trial court supporting and opposing the petitioner's position," and "[a]ny other documents or portions of documents submitted to the trial court that are necessary for a complete understanding of the case and the ruling under review." (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 8.486(b)(1).) Here, the supporting record accompanying the writ petition does not include the briefing related to the motions to compel filed by real party in interest below, or the exhibits supporting the parties' briefs. Accordingly, on or before 8 a.m. on January 17, 2023, petitioner should serve and file in this court a supporting record that complies with Rules of Court, rule 8.486(b)(1).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid through Truefiling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: Exhibits 1 - 13

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate Request for Immediate and Temporary Stay of Discovery Responses and Monetary Sanctions to be Served by January 18, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Napa County Superior Court - Main; County: Napa; Trial Court Case Number: 21CV000242; Trial Court Judge: Smith, Cynthia

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less