This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/02/2022 at 02:48:58 (UTC).

E.V. v. The Superior Court; DPSS

Case Summary

On 01/06/2022 E filed an Other lawsuit against v The Superior Court DPSS. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hansen, Kelly. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8352

  • Filing Date:

    01/06/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hansen, Kelly

 

Party Details

Petitioner

E. V.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Riverside County

Interested Party

Riverside County Department of Public Social Services

Not Yet Classified

C. V.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

3960 Orange St., Fifth Floor

Riverside, CA 92501-3674

Not Yet Classified Attorney

William Alexander Trotter

Attorney at Law Office of William A. Trotter, Esq.

30111 Technology Drive, Suite 160

Murrieta, CA 92563

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to the Withdrawal of Petition filed Mar 14, 2022, the case is dismissed. The stay of the WIC section 366.26 hearing scheduled for Mar 17, 2022, in the juvenile court is lifted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Withdrawal of petition; By petitioner, E.V.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1 (67 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-2 (484 pgs)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Juvenile writ record filed.; Notes: per order of Feb 23, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Amended Clerk's notification of filing notice of intent dtd Feb 24, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: Amended dtd Feb 24, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Feb 24, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Petnr's Feb 18, 2022, mtn for relief from default is granted. The superior court is directed to prepare and file the record on or before 12 days from the date of this order. Petnr's writ petition is due on or before Mar 15, 2022. The Mar 17, 2022, WIC 366.26 hrg is stayed pending further order of this court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: petitioner's mtn for relief, per order of Jan 24, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion for relief from default filed.; Notes: For failure to timely file notice of intent, per order of Jan 24, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute order dtd Feb 10, 2022 appointing Atty Marla Mahoney for petitioner, per order of Jan 24, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Petitioner's notice of intent filed on Jan 6, 2021 is untimely. The Superior Court is directed to appoint counsel for petnr, on or before 10 days from the date of this order. Appointed counsel may serve and file with the clerk of this court, a motion for relief from default in failing to timely file the notice of intent, within 10 days of appointment.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: proof of service for Father

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute order dtd Nov 18, 2021 re: C.V. SWJ160049

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: Dtd Jan 6, 2022; E.V. (Father)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: SWJ1600049; Trial Court Judge: Hansen, Kelly

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where The Superior Court of Riverside County is a litigant

Latest cases where Riverside County Department of Public Social Services is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer William Alexander Trotter