This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/20/2021 at 00:53:56 (UTC).

Estes v. D W W III Co., Inc. et al.

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 Estes filed an Other lawsuit against D W W III Co , Inc. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Salter, Glenn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0501

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Salter, Glenn

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Josephine Estes

Respondents and Defendants

D W W III Co., Inc.

Andrew Kisela

Alex Rosa

Brad Pringle

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

John L. Dodd

Attorney at John L. Dodd & Associates

17621 Irvine Blvd Ste 200

Tustin, CA 92780

Gregory L. Bartone

600 W. Santa Ana Blvd. Suite 814

Santa Ana, CA 92701

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Paul Joseph Kurtzhall

Attorney at Hallstrom, Klein & Ward, LLP

15615 Alton Pkwy Ste 175

Irvine, CA 92618

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/18/2021
  • HearingDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed 07/19/2021. Proceed by rule 8.124 with an appendix and RT A settle statement under rule 8.137

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Aplt associates in as co-counsel on appeal Atty John L. Dodd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appellant Josephine Estes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2020-01168325; Trial Court Judge: Salter, Glenn

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where D W W III CO. INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KURTZHALL PAUL JOSEPH