This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 06/17/2022 at 21:52:02 (UTC).

ENVIRONMENTAL COUNCIL OF SACRAMENTO v. CITY OF ELK GROVE (SOUZA ELK GROVE)

Case Summary

On 10/19/2021 ENVIRONMENTAL COUNCIL OF SACRAMENTO filed an Other lawsuit against CITY OF ELK GROVE SOUZA ELK GROVE. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0964

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Environmental Council of Sacramento

Sierra Club and Friends of the Swainson's Hawk

Respondents and Defendants

City of Elk Grove

City Council of Elk Grove

Souza Elk Grove, LLC

Kamilos Holdings I, LLC

Van Vleck Ranching & Resources Corporation, Inc.

Respondents and Interested Parties

Souza Elk Grove, LLC

Kamilos Holdings I, LLC

Van Vleck Ranching & Resources Corporation, Inc.

Not Yet Classified

California Building Industry Association

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Donald B. Mooney

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Jonathan P. Hobbs

Jennifer Ann Alves

Daniel Paul Doporto

Christian Lucier Marsh

Respondent and Interested Party Attorneys

Daniel Paul Doporto

Christian Lucier Marsh

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Kenneth B. Bley

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Publication request denied

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Publication request denied (case closed)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case start date (publication request)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Request for publication filed (initial case entry); Notes: Pub/Depublication Requestor: California Building Industry Association Attorney: Kenneth B. Bley **The request for publication has been considered and is denied for the reason that the Court of Appeal does not find said opinion meets the criteria for publication as set forth in rule 8.1105(c). The Court of Appeal recommend that the Supreme Court likewise deny the request.**

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Third Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: C089384; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Sacramento County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 34201880002937CUWMGDS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less