This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/28/2023 at 02:13:00 (UTC).

Endeavor Operating Company, LLC v. HDI Global Insurance Company et al.

Case Summary

On 09/30/2022 Endeavor Operating Company, LLC filed an Other lawsuit against HDI Global Insurance Company. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Lu, Elaine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3865

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Lu, Elaine

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Appellant

Endeavor Operating Company, LLC

Defendants and Respondents

HDI Global Insurance Company

ACE Insurance Company

AIG Specialty Insurance Company

Interstate Fire & Casualty Company

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Appellant Attorneys

Robert James Gilbert

Attorney at Latham & Watkins, LLP

200 Clarendon Street 27Th Floor

Boston, MA 2116

David Anthony Barrett

Attorney at Latham & Watkins

555 11Th St Nw Ste 1000

Washington, DC 20004-1327

Kirsten C. Jackson

3984 Tilden Ave

Culver City, CA 90232

Dorn G. Bishop

Attorney at Law Offices of Dorn G. Bishop

10620 Treena St. Suite 230

San Diego, CA 92131

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Laurie J. Hepler

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

50 California Street, Suite 1500

San Francisco, CA 94111

Stefan Caris Love

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

50 California Street, Suite 1500

San Francisco, CA 94111

Kristin C. Cummings

Attorney at ZELLE LLP

901 Main Street, Suite 4000

Dallas, TX 75202

Thomas Joseph D'Antonio

Attorney at Zelle LLP

555 12Th St. Ste 1230

Oakland, CA 94607

Douglas J. Collodel

Attorney at Clyde & Co

355 S. Grand Avenue 14Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Susan Koehler Sullivan

Attorney at Clyde & Co US LLP

355 S Grand Ave Ste 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Gretchen S. Carner

Attorney at Clyde & Co US LLP

355 S Grand Ave, Ste 1400

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Julia M. Beckley

Attorney at Dentons US LLP

2000 Mckinney Avenue Suite 1900

Dallas, TX 75201

Kathryn Courtney Ashton

Attorney at CLYDE & CO US LLP

150 California St. 15Th Floor

San Francisco, CA 94111

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/13/2023
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice granted; Notes: Respondent HDI Global Insurance Company moves this Court to admit Kristin C. Cummings as its counsel pro hac vice. Ms. Cummings is a member in good standing of the Texas Bar and is not currently suspended or disbarred in any court. The motion is hereby granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/12/2023
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice application; Notes: application for pro hac vice for admission of Kristin C. Cummings for respondent

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Kathryn C. Ashton substitutes in as counsel for respondent Interstate Fire and Casualty Commpany

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 02/17/2023 By 60 Day(s) ***AOB + 60 (90 total); RBF + 60 (90 total)***

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: law firm of Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP as co-counsel Respondent HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Douglas J. Collodel appearing as counsel for Respondent ACE Insurance Company

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: This Court has received appellant's notice of appeal. The case has been assigned the above referenced number. Any counsel who are not licensed to practice in the State of California and intend to appear in or file any documents with this Court must first file an application to appear pro hac vice pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 9.40(c)(2). This application must be made to this Court regardless of any previous order granting pro hac vice appearance filed in the trial court. A new application to appear as counsel pro hac vice made to this Court must conform to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.54. Pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 9.40(e), payment of the required fee is to be made to California State Bar and a statement regarding payment must be indicated in the application to this Court.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: notice designating record filed 10/24/2022 LASC;

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Endeavor Operating Company, LLC Attorney: Kirsten C. Jackson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/27/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Endeavor Operating Company, LLCAttorney: Kirsten C. Jackson

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid via credit card for Endeavor Operating Company, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on September 30, 2022 by Endeavor Operating Company, LLC.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV23693; Trial Court Judge: Lu, Elaine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENDEAVOR OPERATING COMPANY LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where Ace Insurance Company of the Midwest is a litigant

Latest cases where HDI GLOBAL INSURANCE COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases where AIG Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant