This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 02/13/2021 at 06:03:25 (UTC).

Emerson Maintenance Association v. Gorenberg et al.

Case Summary

On 07/27/2020 Emerson Maintenance Association filed an Other lawsuit against Gorenberg. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Salter, Glenn. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9246

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Salter, Glenn

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Emerson Maintenance Association

Appellants and Defendants

Ladan Hariri

Alan Gorenberg

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorney

Pamela Abbott Moore

Attorney at The Law Office of Pamela Abbott Moore

1111 E Katella Ave Suite 200

Orange, CA 92867

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Douglas Vanderpool

Attorney at The Vanderpool Law Firm

330 Main Street, Suite 203 B

Seal Beach, CA 90740

Michael J. Fairchild

Attorney at The Vanderpool Law Firm

330 Main St., Ste 203B

Seal Beach, CA 90740

Martin W. Anderson

2070 N Tustin Avenue

Santa Ana, CA 92705-7827

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent rescinding 8.220(a) notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 02/16/2021 By 64 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: 1 CT, pages 1-291

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Filed on 08/05/2020(Proceeding under rule 8.122 with settled statement)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/03/2020
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Attorney Douglas B. Vanderpool SUBS OUT for appellant Alan Gorenberg. Attorney Martin W. Anderson SUBS IN.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/20/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid by appellant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appellant: Alan Gorenberg et al Also appealing: 6/29/20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2018-01027462; Trial Court Judge: Salter, Glenn

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Emerson Maintenance Association is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MOORE PAMELA ABBOTT