This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 12/20/2022 at 22:00:54 (UTC).

Emanate Health Foothill Presbyterian Hospital v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 06/10/2022 Emanate Health Foothill Presbyterian Hospital filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Falls, Thomas. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0910

  • Filing Date:

    06/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Falls, Thomas

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Emanate Health Foothill Presbyterian Hospital

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Thomas Falls

Pomona, CA 91766

Interested Party

Ismael Robles

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Daniel K. Dik

Attorney at Fraser Watson & Croutch, LLP

100 West Broadway Suite 650

Glendale, CA 91210-1201

Karine Mkrtchyan

Attorney at Fraser Watson & Croutch

100 W. Broadway, Suite 650

Glendale, CA 91210

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Brian Scott Van Allen

Attorney at Belgum, Fry & Van Allen LLP

1905 E Route 66 Ste 102

Glendora, CA 91740-4679

Stephen Lee Belgum

Attorney at Belgum, Fry & Van Allen LLP

1905 E Route 66 Ste 102

Glendora, CA 91740

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/01/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The court has read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed June 10, 2022. The petition is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Responsive filing fee $390 paid via credit card.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice for responsive filing fee sent to:; Notes: Belgum, Fry & Van Allen LLP (RPI's counsel)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: letter from RPI Ismael Robles in response to writ petition (procedural/substantive defects within writ petition)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received document entitled:; Notes: 3 vol. of exhibits w/descriptive bookmarks

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Email sent to:; Notes: Notice of non-compliance emailed to petitioner's counsel.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Three volumes of exhibits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate with STAY.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where EMANATE HEALTH FOOTHILL PRESBYTERIAN HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BELGUM STEPHEN LEE

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAN ALLEN BRIAN SCOTT