This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/25/2023 at 02:16:33 (UTC).

Elyaszadeh v. Murphy et al.

Case Summary

On 01/24/2022 Elyaszadeh filed an Other lawsuit against Murphy. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 8 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Mandel, Elaine. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8219

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Mandel, Elaine

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Shahram Elyaszadeh

Appellants and Defendants

Paul D. Murphy

Murphy Rosen LLP

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Robin Meadow

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

6420 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Laura Grace Lim

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

6420 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 1100

Los Angeles, CA 90048

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/09/2023
  • DocketDescription: Ruling on motion.; Notes: The court has read and considered respondents motion to withdraw as counsel of record filed February 10, 2023. The motion is granted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Filed declaration of:; Notes: DECLARATION OF ANDREW E. HEWITT RE SERVICE OF MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS AND RESPONDENTS SHAHRAM ELYASZADEH AND YONA SAMIH ATTORNEYS FOR PLAINTIFFS AND RESPONDENTS Shahram Elyaszadeh and Yona Samih

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Respondent's brief. Due on 04/14/2023 By 59 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL OF RECORD FOR PLAINTIFFS AND RESPONDENTS SHAHRAM ELYASZADEH AND YONA SAMIH ATTORNEYS FOR PLAINTIFFS AND RESPONDENTS Shahram Elyaszadeh and Yona Samih

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Respondent's brief. Requested for 04/14/2023 By 59 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Change of address filed for:; Notes: Attorneys for Defendants and Appellants

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: *** Motion/Request Deferred ***; Notes: The ruling on appellant's request for judicial notice filed November 14, 2022 is deferred for decision by the panel that will be assigned to decide this appeal after briefing is complete. Any party opposing the request may state its opposition in the opposing brief or in a separate filing. The parties may refer to the material that is the subject of the request for judicial notice in their briefs without prejudice to this court deciding either to grant or deny the request in the course of resolving the appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix filed.; Notes: APPELLANTS' APPENDIX Volume 1 of 1 / Pages 1-374

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Paul D. Murphy Attorney: Laura Grace Lim Attorney: Robin Meadow Defendant and Appellant: Murphy Rosen LLP Attorney: Laura Grace Lim Attorney: Robin Meadow

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Motion to vacate dismissal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: It appearing that the appellant is in default pursuant to Rule 8.140(b), California Rules of Court, the appeal filed January 24, 2022, is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.; Notes: clerk's notice of non-compliance of default on appeal, dated 4/26/2022; failure to pay RT fees/deposits.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Paul D. Murphy Attorney: Robin Meadow Defendant and Appellant: Murphy Rosen LLP Attorney: Robin Meadow

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Paul D. MurphyAttorney: Robin Meadow Defendant and Appellant: Murphy Rosen LLPAttorney: Robin Meadow

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Substitution of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Robin Meadow of Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP is substituted as counsel of record for respondents Murphy et al. Adam LeBerthon of Wilson Elser Moskowitz Edelman & LLP is substituted out.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check ##398833 for $775

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on January 24, 2022 by Paul D. Murphy et al.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/02/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20SMCV01448; Trial Court Judge: Mandel, Elaine

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less