This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 09/12/2021 at 09:18:24 (UTC).

ELEBY (KEVIN) ON H.C.

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 ELEBY KEVIN ON H C was filed as an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9666

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • Courthouse:

    California Supreme Court

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Kevin Eleby

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

The People

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Marc Eric Norton

Attorney at Law Office Marc Eric Norton

P.O. Box 162

Zamora, CA 95698

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/25/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied; Notes: Cantil-Sakauye, C.J., was absent and did not participate.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Proof of Service regarding Application to File an Over-length brief Kevin Eleby, Petitioner Marc Eric Norton, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: Notice of errata correcting caption on cover page. Kevin Eleby, Petitioner Marc Eric Norton, Retained counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record has been imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed with permission; Notes: Petitioner: Kevin Eleby Attorney: Marc Eric Norton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: Dear Sir: The court has granted permission to file the overlength petition for review and the petition was filed this date.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application to file over-length brief filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Received oversized petition for review; Notes: Petitioner: Kevin Eleby Attorney: Marc Eric Norton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 1; Court of Appeal Case Number: B311782; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: BA394931

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where People is a litigant