This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 07/26/2021 at 03:39:32 (UTC).

EISENBERG v. CA 3

Case Summary

On 07/06/2021 EISENBERG filed an Other - Other Criminal lawsuit against CA 3. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9691

  • Filing Date:

    07/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Criminal

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Jon B. Eisenberg

Healdsburg, CA 95448

Respondents

Court of Appeal, Third Appellate District

914 Capitol Mall

Sacramento, CA 95814

Judicial Council of California

455 Golden Gate Avenue

San Francisco, CA 94102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Informal response requested; Notes: Presiding Justice Vance W. Raye Court of Appeal, Third Appellate District 914 Capitol Mall, Sacramento, CA 95814 Re: S269691 - Eisenberg (Jon) v. Court of Appeal, Third Appellate District, et al. Dear Presiding Judge: The court has directed that I request an informal response to the petition for writ of mandate in the above-referenced matter. The petition was served on your court on July 6, 2021. The answer is to be served upon counsel for petitioner and filed in this court on or before August 9, 2021. Petitioner may then file a reply on or before August 19, 2021. Thank you for your attention to this matter. Sincerely, JORGE E. NAVARRETE Clerk and Executive Officer of the Supreme Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: JUSTICE RECUSED; Notes: Chief Justice Tani Cantil-Sakauye and Associate Justice Carol Corrigan hereby recuse themselves from participating in the matter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibit(s) lodged; Notes: Volume IV of IV, pages 847-1117.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibit(s) lodged; Notes: Volume III of IV, pages 565-846.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibit(s) lodged; Notes: Volume II of IV, pages 283-564.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibit(s) lodged; Notes: Volume I of IV, pages 1-282.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed:; Notes: Declaration of Jon B. Eisenberg.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for writ of mandate/prohibition filed (against CA); Notes: Petitioner: Jon B. Eisenberg Pro Per

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Court of Appeal, Third Appellate District is a litigant

Latest cases where JUDICIAL COUNCIL OF CALIFORNIA is a litigant