This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/16/2022 at 01:07:59 (UTC).

eGumball, Inc v. Merrick Bank Corporation et al.

Case Summary

On 11/04/2021 eGumball, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Merrick Bank Corporation. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Crandall, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0853

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Crandall, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

eGumball, Inc

Appellants and Defendants

Merrick Bank Corporation

Visa, Inc

Paysafe Payment Processing Solutions, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Nadia Ann Sarkis

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland, LLP

5900 Wilshire Blvd. 12Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Babak Samini

Attorney at The Samini Firm, APC

650 Town Center Drive., Ste 1700

Costa Mesa, CA 92626

Appellant and Defendant Attorneys

Daniel G. Gurfein

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

230 Park Avenue, Suite 1130

New York, NY 10169-0079

Paul Joseph Killion

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1 Market Spear Tower Ste 2200

San Francisco, CA 94105

James J. Regan

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP,

230 Park Avenue, Suite 1130

New York, NY 10169

Justin Jeremy Fields

1 Market Plz Spear Tower Suite 2200

San Francisco, CA 94105

Christopher Todd Norris

Attorney at Duane Morris LLP

1 Market Plz Ste 2200

San Francisco, CA 94105-1127

Timothy William Loose

Attorney at Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher

333 S Grand Ave Ste 5245

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Blaine Hill Evanson

Attorney at Gibson Dunn & Crutcher LLP

3161 Michelson Drive

Irvine, CA 92612

Daron Barsamian

Attorney at Roxborough, Pomerance, Nye & Adreani LLP

5820 Canoga Ave Ste 250

Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6549

Gary Alan Nye

Attorney at Roxborough Pomerance Nye & Adreani LLP

5820 Canoga Ave # 250

Woodland Hills, CA 91367-6512

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • HearingDescription: Misc. fee received for:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/31/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Merrick Bank Corporation Defendant and Appellant: Visa, Inc Attorney: Blaine Hill Evanson Defendant and Appellant: Paysafe Payment Processing Solutions, LLC Joint appellant appendix and opening breif filed by all three appellants'As to aplt Merrick Bank Corp: One extension granted for a total of 60 days: 01/24/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/15/2022 By 60 Day(s). As to aplt Visa Inc.: One extension granted for a total of 60 days: 01/27/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/15/2022 By 60 Day(s)1-volume of appendix (373 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 05/31/2022; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: eGumball, IncAttorney: Babak Samini Attorney: Nadia Ann Sarkis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Merrick Bank Corporation Defendant and Appellant: Visa, IncAttorney: Blaine Hill Evanson Defendant and Appellant: Paysafe Payment Processing Solutions, LLC; Notes: Joint appellant appendix and opening breif filed by all three appellants'As to aplt Merrick Bank Corp: One extension granted for a total of 60 days: 01/24/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/15/2022 By 60 Day(s). As to aplt Visa Inc.: One extension granted for a total of 60 days: 01/27/2022 Granted - extension of time. Due on 04/15/2022 By 60 Day(s)1-volume of appendix (373 pages)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice granted; Notes: The unopposed applications by James J. Regan and Daniel G. Gurfein to appear as counsel pro hac vice for appellant Merrick Bank Corporation are GRANTED. (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 9.40.) C. Todd Norris is an active member of the State Bar of California and is associated as counsel of record for appellant Merrick Bank Corporation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: Application of Atty James J. Regan to appear pro hac vice on behalf of appellant MERRICK BANK CORPORATION. Application of Atty Daniel G. Gurfein to appear pro hac vice on behalf of appellant Merrick Bank Corporation.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketDescription: Note:; Notes: No opposition was filed to aplts' pro hac vice applications

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: pro hac vice application; Notes: By Aplt. Merrick Bank Corporation for attorney Daniel G. Gurfein to appear pro hac vice.

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 filing fee Paid by aplt. Visa, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: By Visa, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: By Paysafe Payment Processing Solutions.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Appellant fee paid by appellant Merrick Bank.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: 3 appellants are each represented by different attorneys

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Appellant proceeding w/RT in lieu of CT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: CSR: Teresa Kenworthy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appellant: Merrick Bank Corporation et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Orange County Superior Court - Main; County: Orange; Trial Court Case Number: 30-2021-01216871; Trial Court Judge: Crandall, James

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where PAYSAFE PAYMENT PROCESSING SOLUTIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where VISA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where EGUMBALL, INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Merrick Bank Corporation is a litigant