This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 01/06/2022 at 03:28:27 (UTC).

Ebeling v. Morning View Hotel BH I&II, LLC.

Case Summary

On 05/11/2021 Ebeling filed an Other lawsuit against Morning View Hotel BH I II, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3070

  • Filing Date:

    05/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Alexandra Ebeling

Respondent and Defendant

Morning View Hotel BH I&II, LLC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Albert Anthony Villaneda

Attorney at MANSELL MANSELL AYALA + VILLANEDA,

1645 Vine St. #306

Los Angeles, CA 90028

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Terrence Lee Cranert

Attorney at Pollard, Cranert, Crawford & Stevens

35 N. Lake Avenue Suite 500

Pasadena, CA 91101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/16/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court; Disposition Type: Final Abandonment filed on July 15, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Abandonment of appeal filed in trial court.; Notes: Abandonment filed on July 15, 2021 in trial court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.; Notes: Appellant (May 11, 2021: Alexandra Ebeling ) is in default for failure to file a Case Information Statement pursuant to California Rules of Court, Rule 8.100(g).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Mansell, Cheryl.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: May 11, 2021: Alexandra Ebeling

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV02925

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MORNING VIEW HOTEL BH I & II LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CRANERT TERRENCE L