This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 11/15/2021 at 02:41:32 (UTC).

East Coast Foods, Inc. et al. v. KG Law, APC et al.

Case Summary

On 05/10/2021 East Coast Foods, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against KG Law, APC. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Fahey, William. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3056

  • Filing Date:

    05/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Fahey, William

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

East Coast Foods, Inc.

Herbert Hudson

Respondents and Defendants

KG Law, APC.

Vahe V. Khojayan

KG Law, APC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Carlos A. De La Paz

Attorney at Rostam Law Inc.

453 S. Spring St. Ste 841

Los Angeles, CA 90013-2086

Glen H. Mertens

Attorney at Rostam Law, Inc.

453 S. Spring St. Suite 841

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Respondent and Defendant Attorney

Vikram Sohal

Attorney at Nemecek & Cole

16255 Ventura Blvd. Suite 300

Encino, CA 91436-2300

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order granting relief from 8.140(b) default filed.; Notes: Good cause appearing, appellants' August 23, 2021 motion for relief from default, for the appeal filed May 10, 2021, is hereby granted. Appellant is granted relief from any and all current defaults occasioned by appellant's failure to comply as required by the rules of court. Appellant must pay the reporter's transcript fees pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.130(b) within 15 days from the date of this order. The reporter's transcript fees must be paid at the Los Angeles Superior Court at 111 North Hill Street, Room 111-A, Los Angeles, California. Appellant shall take immediate action to cure the default and, under no circumstances, shall appellant take more than 15 days to do so. If appellant fails to cure the default in a timely manner, the Clerk of the Superior Court shall immediately notify the Court of Appeal, and the appeal will be dismissed without further notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default re: 8.130(b) rptrs fees not deposited rcvd. dtd.; Notes: non-compliance from lasc filed Aug 16, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion for relief from default filed.; Notes: Appellants' motion to grant relief from default

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: East Coast Foods, Inc. Attorney: Carlos A. De La Paz Plaintiff and Appellant: Herbert Hudson Attorney: Carlos A. De La Paz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: East Coast Foods, Inc.Attorney: Carlos A. De La Paz Plaintiff and Appellant: Herbert HudsonAttorney: Carlos A. De La Paz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Civil filing fee paid by Stewart, Douglas.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: May 10, 2021: East Coast Foods, Inc., et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 19STCV32858; Trial Court Judge: Fahey, William

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where EAST COAST FOODS INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer SOHAL VIKRAM