This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 10/06/2021 at 01:40:58 (UTC).

EAGLE FARMS v. CALCOT

Case Summary

On 03/01/2021 EAGLE FARMS filed an Other - Other Judicial Review lawsuit against CALCOT. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7364

  • Filing Date:

    03/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judicial Review

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellants and Plaintiffs

Eric Matthews

Jamie Shaw

M & G Farms

Ellis Farms

JMU Farming LLC

IG Farms

Clayton Golson

RPT Farms

AKE Farms

Timothy Maher

Ian Gillespie

Ardell Ruiz

Mary Maher

Gillespie Farms

Eagle Farms

Stanley Ellis

El Fuerte Farms

Sierra Farming Partnership II

Skousen Farms, LLC

Respondent and Defendant

Calcot, LTD.

46 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Ralph B. Wegis

Attorney at Law Offices of Ralph B. Wegis

1930 Truxtun Avenue

Bakersfield, CA 93301

Joseph H. Low

Attorney at Law Offices of Joseph H. Low IV

100 Oceangate, 12Th Floor

Long Beach, CA 90802

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

William Alan Molinski

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP

777 S Figueroa Street, Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Kelsi Brown Corkran

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliffe LLP

1152 15Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Robert M. Dowd

Attorney at Griswold, LaSalle, Cobb, Dowd & Gin, LLP

111 E. Seventh Street

Hanford, CA 93230

Rachel G Shalev

Attorney at Orrick, Herrington & Sutcliff LLP

1152 15Th Street Nw

Washington, DC 20005

Michael Richard Johnson

Attorney at Griswold LaSalle Cobb Dowd & Gin LLP

111 E. 7Th Street

Hanford, CA 93230-4641

William A. Molinski

Attorney at Orrick Herrington & Sutcliffe, LLP

777 S Figueroa Street, Suite 3200

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/21/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/21/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Reply to answer to petition filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Eagle Farms Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Allen Ellis Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: AKE Farms Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Clayton Golson Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Clinton Wofford Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Cockrill Brothers Farms Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Cory Weddle Farms Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Wofford Farms Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Cruye & Ellis Blackwater Farms Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: El Fuerte Farms Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: England Farms Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Eric Matthews Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Ardell Ruiz Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Ian Gillespie Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: IG Farms Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Jamie Shaw Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: JMU Farming LLC Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: M & G Farms Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Mark Gillespie Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Gillespie Farms Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Mark Poe Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: RPT Farms Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Mary Maher Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: TM Farms Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Matthews Ruiz, LLC Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Morning Star Farms Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Sierra Farming Partnership II Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Skousen Farms, LLC Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Stanley Ellis Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Ellis Farms Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Timothy Maher Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis Plaintiff and Appellant: Toby Sullivan Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketDescription: Answer to petition for review filed; Notes: Defendant and Respondent: Calcot, LTD. Attorney: William A. Molinski

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record imported and available electronically.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Eagle Farms Attorney: Ralph B. Wegis *ET AL.*

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Fifth Appellate District; Court of Appeal Case Number: F077565; Disposition: Affirmed in full; Trial Court: Kern County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: S1500CV278617

    Read MoreRead Less