This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 10/09/2021 at 01:39:59 (UTC).

Duarte Juarez v. Ward et al.

Case Summary

On 06/01/2021 Duarte Juarez filed an Other lawsuit against Ward. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3272

  • Filing Date:

    06/01/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Maira E. Duarte Juarez

Respondents and Defendants

David S. Ward

Academy of Motion Pictures Arts and Sciences

Respondent and Intervenor

Academy of Motion Pictures Arts and Sciences

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

Benjamin Gregory Ramm

Attorney at Law Offices of Benjamin G. Ramm

9450 Sw Gemini Dr, #93082

Beaverton, OR 97008-7105

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Ira M. Friedman

Attorney at Friedman & Friedman

9454 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 313

Beverly Hills, CA 90212

Christopher Tayback

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

865 South Figueroa Street 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Respondent and Intervenor Attorney

Christopher Tayback

Attorney at Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan, LLP

865 South Figueroa Street 10Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/29/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated June 10, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Maira E. Duarte Juarez Attorney: Benjamin Gregory Ramm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Maira E. Duarte JuarezAttorney: Benjamin Gregory Ramm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: Granted on June 29, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: by appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on 06/01/2021 by Maira E. Duarte Jaurez

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 20STCP02070

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TAYBACK CHRISTOPHER