Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 01/25/2021 at 22:31:56 (UTC).

Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc. et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Case Summary

On 09/06/2019 Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Keeny, C.. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0467

  • Filing Date:

    09/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    Second Appellate District - Division 3

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Keeny, C.

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Medical Concierge, Inc.

Soveriegn Asset Management, Inc.

Adeona Healthcare, Inc.

Satya Health of California, Inc.

Tonmoy Sharma

Vedanta Laboratories, Inc.

Soveriegn Health of Florida, Inc.

Sovereign Health of Phoenix, Inc.

Dual Diagnosis Treatment Center, Inc.

Shreya Health of California, Inc.

Shreya Health of Arizona, Inc.

Shreya Health of Florida, Inc.

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Virginia Keeny

Van Nuys, CA 91401

Interested Parties

Health Net Life Insurance Company

Health Net, Inc.

Mahyar Mohases and CRMW Inc.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Lisa S. Kantor

Attorney at Kantor & Kantor, LLP.

19839 Nordhoff St.

Northridge, CA 91324

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Gregory Neil Pimstone

Attorney at Manatt Phelps Phillips LLP

11355 West Olympic Boulevard

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1614

John M. Leblanc

Attorney at Manatt, Phelps & Phillips, LLP

11355 West Olympic Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1614

Joanna S. McCallum

Attorney at Manatt Phelps & Philips LLP

11355 W. Olympic Blvd.

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1614

Michael Jonas Fitzgerald

Attorney at FitzGerald Yap Kreditor, LLP,

2 Park Plz Ste 850

Irvine, CA 92614-2521

Eric Peter Francisconi

Attorney at Fitzgerald Yap Kreditor LLP

2 Park Plaza, Suite 850

Irvine, CA 92614

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2019
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final THE COURT: We have read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed September 5, 2019, the opposition thereto filed September 12, 2019, and the reply filed September 20, 2019. The petition for writ of mandate is denied for failure to demonstrate entitlement to extraordinary relief. Edmon, P.J., Lavin, J., and Egerton, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: THE COURT: We have read and considered the petition for writ of mandate filed September 5, 2019, the opposition thereto filed September 12, 2019, and the reply filed September 20, 2019. The petition for writ of mandate is denied for failure to demonstrate entitlement to extraordinary relief. Edmon, P.J., Lavin, J., and Egerton, J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketDescription: Filed document entitled:; Notes: Petitioner's exhibits in support of reply

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2019
  • DocketDescription: Reply filed to:; Notes: In support of Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/12/2019
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: RPI

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2019
  • DocketDescription: Errata filed to:; Notes: Petitioner's Notice of Errata

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits filed in support of:; Notes: Volume 1 of 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/05/2019
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where SHREYA HEALTH OF CALIFORNIA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases where SOVEREING ASSET MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant