This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 04/03/2022 at 21:31:25 (UTC).

DREVALEVA v. ALAMEDA HEALTH SYSTEM

Case Summary

On 08/10/2021 DREVALEVA filed an Other lawsuit against ALAMEDA HEALTH SYSTEM. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***9930

  • Filing Date:

    08/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Tatyana E. Drevaleva

Defendant and Respondent

Alameda Health System

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Scott C. Ku

Timothy C. Travelstead

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

10/13/2021

DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
10/13/2021

DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
09/24/2021

DocketDescription: Time extended to grant or deny review; Notes: The time for granting or denying review in the above-entitled matter is hereby extended to and including November 8, 2021, or the date upon which review is either granted or denied.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Forma Pauperis application granted

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Forma pauperis application filed

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Received:; Notes: additional proof of service

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/10/2021

DocketDescription: Case start: Petition for review filed; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Tatyana E. Drevaleva Pro Per

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/19/2021

DocketDescription: Received premature petition for review; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Tatyana E. Drevaleva Pro Per

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/08/2021

DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: First Appellate District , Div. v; Court of Appeal Case Number: A162908; Disposition: Litigant declared vexatious; Trial Court: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; Trial Court Case Number: RG20066898

[+] Read More [-] Read Less