This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 07/23/2020 at 21:27:03 (UTC).

D.R. v. The Superior Court of Yolo County

Case Summary

On 01/22/2020 D R filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court of Yolo County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Third Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Dyer, Tom. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1357

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Dyer, Tom

 

Party Details

Petitioner

D. R.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Yolo County

Interested Parties

R. E.

Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency

J. E.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Christina Z. Beede

Interested Party Attorneys

Linda R. Case

Megan Janell Callaway

Natalie Danielle Moore

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

02/10/2020

DispositionDescription: All documents refiled into different case; Disposition Type: Final See C091355 for all further filings.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2020

DocketDescription: Case complete.

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2020

DocketDescription: Filed order consolidating with case:; Notes: The notice of intent received in case number C091357, D.R. v. The Superior Court of Yolo County, is construed as a notice of appeal and consolidated with case number C091355, Yolo County Health and Human Services Agency v. R.E. All further filings will bear case number C091355. The record on appeal remains due February 20, 2020. RAYE, P.J. (MMu)

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
01/29/2020

DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: Filed in the trial court on 01/22/20. Record due: 2/18/2020

[+] Read More [-] Read Less