This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/04/2021 at 16:31:35 (UTC).

Downes v. Belmont Park Entertainment, LLC

Case Summary

On 08/19/2020 Downes filed an Other lawsuit against Belmont Park Entertainment, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Whitney, Richard. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***7851

  • Filing Date:

    08/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Whitney, Richard

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Robert Downes

Defendant and Respondent

Belmont Park Entertainment, LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorney

John S. Addams

Attorney at Niddrie Addams Fuller Singh LLP

600 West Broadway, Suite 1200

San Diego, CA 92101

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Vikas Nagpal

Attorney at Bremer Whyte Brown & O'Meara, LLP

501 West Broadway, Ste. 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Johnpaul Najah Salem

Attorney at Bremer Whyte Brown & O'Meara LLP

501 W Broadway Ste 1700

San Diego, CA 92101-3566

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2021
  • HearingDescription: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/18/2021
  • HearingDescription: Opposition filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX AND OPENING BRIEF FILED.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Robert Downes Attorney: John S. Addams AA - 1 (337 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketDescription: Motion filed.; Notes: Motion to add new evidence

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketBrief: RESPONDENT'S BRIEF.; Due Date: 04/02/2021; Party Attorney: Defendant and Respondent: Belmont Park Entertainment, LLCAttorney: Johnpaul Najah Salem Attorney: Vikas Nagpal

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/03/2021
  • DocketBrief: APPELLANT'S APPENDIX AND OPENING BRIEF FILED.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Robert DownesAttorney: John S. Addams; Notes: AA - 1 (337 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketDescription: REPORTER'S TRANSCRIPT FILED***; Notes: RT - 2 (19 pages)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/28/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2020
  • DocketDescription: Transcript fees paid.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2020
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/02/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellate package sent.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed Aug. 19, 2020 by ROBERT DOWNES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/23/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Diego County Superior Court - Main; County: San Diego; Trial Court Case Number: 37-2017-00041162-CU-PO-CTL; Trial Court Judge: Whitney, Richard

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less