This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/24/2022 at 00:32:51 (UTC).

Doe v. Regents of the University of California

Case Summary

On 09/13/2021 Doe filed an Other lawsuit against Regents of the University of California. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 1 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Grillo, Evelio. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3535

  • Filing Date:

    09/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Grillo, Evelio

 

Party Details

Appellant and Petitioner

Jane Doe

Respondent

Regents of the University of California

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Petitioner Attorneys

Mark M. Hathaway

Attorney at Hathaway Parker Inc.

445 South Figueroa Street, 31St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Jenna E. Parker

Attorney at Hathaway Parker

445 S. Figueroa Street, 31St Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Respondent Attorneys

Monique G Matar

Attorney at PAUL, PLEVIN, SULLIVAN & CONNAUGHTON LLP

101 West Broadway, Ninth Floor

San Diego, CA 92101-8285

Sandra Lynn McDonough

Attorney at Paul, Plevin, Sullivan & Connaughton LLP

101 W Broadway Fl 9

San Diego, CA 92101

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's opening brief.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Jane Doe Attorney: Mark M. Hathaway

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketBrief: Respondent's brief.; Due Date: 07/18/2022; Party Attorney: Respondent: Regents of the University of CaliforniaAttorney: Monique G Matar

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Jane DoeAttorney: Mark M. Hathaway

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Jane Doe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant notified re failure to timely file opening brief.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Jane Doe

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 05/20/2022 By 59 Day(s) AOB stipulated to May 20, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: C-4(e-filed), R-3(e-filed), Admin Records 5 Volumes(e-filed) **Entire Record Electronic**

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of county clerk filed.; Notes: Filed 02/07/2022 by L. Lee. Appellant has designated to proceed per CT and RT. No further record shall be coming from Superior Court.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Petitioner and Appellant: Jane Doe Attorney: Mark M. Hathaway Minute Order attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Petitioner and Appellant: Jane DoeAttorney: Mark M. Hathaway; Notes: Minute Order attached.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Paid. Receipt #R156538

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 09/13/2021 by Counsel for Petitioner Jane Doe appealing order from 07/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG20068696; Trial Court Judge: Grillo, Evelio

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MCDONOUGH, SANDRA L