This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 04/03/2021 at 12:08:14 (UTC).

Doe v. Regents of the University of California

Case Summary

On 11/25/2020 Doe filed an Other lawsuit against Regents of the University of California. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 3 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Reilly, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1546

  • Filing Date:

    11/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    California Courts Of Appeal

  • Courthouse:

    First Appellate District - Division 3

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Reilly, James

 

Party Details

Plaintiff, Respondent, Petitioner and Appellant

John Doe

Appellants, Respondents and Petitioners

Jane Doe

John Doe

Jane Roe

Defendant and Respondent

Regents of the University of California

Defendants, Respondents, Petitioners and Appellants

Regents of the University of California

John Doe

Appellant and Not Yet Classified

Jane Roe

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent, Appellant, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Jenna E. Parker

Attorney at Hathaway Parker

445 S. Figueroa Street, 31St Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Mark M. Hathaway

Attorney at Hathaway Parker Inc.

445 South Figueroa Street, 31St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Robyn Carrico Crowther

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

633 W. Fifth Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Amanda Savage

Attorney at Public Counsel

610 South Ardmore Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90005-2322

Brenda Star Adams

Attorney at Equal Rights Advocates

1170 Market Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94102

Kathryn Ann Eidmann

Attorney at Public Counsel Law Center

610 South Ardmore Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90005

Melanie Ayerh

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

633 W. 5Th Street, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3503

Maha Hammam Ibrahim

Attorney at Equal Rights Advocates

1170 Market Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94102

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Hailyn J. Chen

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Cassidy Hunter Hayes

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson

350 S Grand Ave Fl 50

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

Defendant, Respondent, Plaintiff and Petitioner Attorneys

Hailyn J. Chen

Attorney at Munger Tolles & Olson LLP

350 South Grand Avenue 50Th Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Cassidy Hunter Hayes

Attorney at Munger, Tolles & Olson

350 S Grand Ave Fl 50

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3426

Jenna E. Parker

Attorney at Hathaway Parker

445 S. Figueroa Street, 31St Fl.

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Mark M. Hathaway

Attorney at Hathaway Parker Inc.

445 South Figueroa Street, 31St Floor

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Appellant and Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Robyn Carrico Crowther

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

633 W. Fifth Street

Los Angeles, CA 90071

Amanda Savage

Attorney at Public Counsel

610 South Ardmore Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90005-2322

Brenda Star Adams

Attorney at Equal Rights Advocates

1170 Market Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94102

Kathryn Ann Eidmann

Attorney at Public Counsel Law Center

610 South Ardmore Avenue

Los Angeles, CA 90005

Melanie Ayerh

Attorney at Steptoe & Johnson LLP

633 W. 5Th Street, Suite 1900

Los Angeles, CA 90071-3503

Maha Hammam Ibrahim

Attorney at Equal Rights Advocates

1170 Market Street, Suite 700

San Francisco, CA 94102

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2021
  • HearingDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Pending eot

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2021
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: Opposition to extension fo time to file opposition to motion to dismiss.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Opposition filed. Due on 04/15/2021 By 55 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Opposition filed. Requested for 04/15/2021 By 55 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Requested for 04/15/2021 By 52 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed. Due on 04/15/2021 By 52 Day(s)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Ms. Crowther, The Court has received your letter for an application for an extension of time and to "consolidate the briefing schedule" on February 9, 2021. The letter has been "received and not filed" as it is not in the proper format for such request. The Court will not act on the requests you made until they are filed in the proper format according to the California Rules of Court and Local Rules. An applications are governed by CRC Rule 8.50, motions are governed by CRC Rule 8.54. Extensions of time are done by a pleading or there is a form on our website and are governed by CRC Rule 8.60. I am not sure what you mean by "consolidate the briefing schedule" as this court is unaware of a related pending appeal in this matter in which to consolidate. If we are incorrect, please bring it to our attention. The briefing schedule is determined by CRC Rule 8.200, 8.204 and 8.212. A briefing schedule must be stipulated by motion or application and filed as such. Garth King First District Court of Appeal - Division Three 350 McAllister Street San Francisco, CA. 94102

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Letter to Deputy Clerks asking for an extension of time to file opposition to appellant Jane Doe's motion to dismiss and for "consolidation of the briefing schedule". ***Received not filed***

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Exhibits lodged.; Notes: In Support of Motion for Involuntary Dismissal of Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 01/12/2021
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 12/08/2020. Designating 8.124 with RT(attached).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of interested entities or persons filed by:; Notes: APPELLANT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Movant and Appellant: Jane Roe Attorney: Robyn Carrico Crowther with order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's appendix and opening brief filed.; Due Date: 04/15/2021; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Respondent: John DoeAttorney: Jenna E. Parker Attorney: Mark M. Hathaway Movant and Appellant: Jane RoeAttorney: Amanda Savage Attorney: Brenda Star Adams Attorney: Kathryn Ann Eidmann Attorney: Maha Hammam Ibrahim Attorney: Melanie Ayerh Attorney: Robyn Carrico Crowther

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Movant and Appellant: Jane RoeAttorney: Robyn Carrico Crowther; Notes: with order attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check # 60057, Specialized Legal Services, Inc.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Filed 11/25/2020 by Counsel for Appellant Jane Doe appealing order from 09/24/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Alameda County Superior Court - Main; County: Alameda; Trial Court Case Number: RG18888616; Trial Court Judge: Reilly, James

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CROWTHER ROBYN