This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 09/03/2023 at 00:14:59 (UTC).

Doe v. Ford Models, Inc., a New York Corporation

Case Summary

On 02/28/2022 Doe filed an Other lawsuit against Ford Models, Inc , a New York Corporation. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Karlan, Craig. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8923

  • Filing Date:

    02/28/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Karlan, Craig

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Jane Doe

Appellant and Defendant

Ford Models, Inc., a New York Corporation

Defendants

Jordan Doner

Ford Models, Inc., a New York Corporation

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Arya Rhodes

Alan Irwin Schimmel

Michael W. Parks

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Michael Alexander Sigall

Matthew X. Oster

Cassandra J. Zappaterreno

John Vincent Hogan, IV

 

Court Documents

B318923

Court of Appeal Opinion

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/03/2023
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Affirmed in full; Disposition Type: Final; Publication Status: Signed Unpublished; Author: Baker, Lamar W.; Participants: Moor, Carl H. (Concur) Kim, Dorothy C. (Concur)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/03/2023
  • DocketDescription: Opinion filed.; Notes: (Signed Unpublished) The judgment is affirmed. Doe shall recover her costs on appeal. Baker-Moor-Kim / 8 pages

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/30/2023
  • DocketDescription: Cause argued and submitted.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Arya Rhodes for Respondent (10 minutes) - Remote [Counsel Michael W. Parks no longer arguing ]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Michael W. Parks for Respondent (10 minutes) - Remote

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request for oral argument filed by:; Notes: Matthew Oster for Appellant ( 15 minutes) - Remote

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Order filed.; Notes: Respondent's motion to continue oral argument is denied.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Request to continue oral arg - to court.; Notes: Respondent's motion to continue oral argument.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/31/2023
  • DocketDescription: Calendar notice sent electronically. Calendar date:; Notes: June 30, 2023 at 9:00am

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
26 More Docket Entries
  • 07/01/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/03/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: The notice of election to proceed pursuant to California Rules of Court, rule 8.124 has been received and assigned the above case number. Appellant did not serve and file a notice to prepare a reporter's transcript. The appendix and opening brief are due within 70 days from the filing of the notice of election with the trial court (California Rules of Court, rule 8.212(a)(1)(B)).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/28/2022
  • DocketDescription: Proceeding by 8.124 - no reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated Feb. 28, 2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: Check #399369 for $775

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Defendant and Appellant: Ford Models, Inc., a New York Corporation Attorney: Matthew X. Oster Attorney: Michael Alexander Sigall Defendant: Jordan Doner Attorney: Cassandra J. Zappaterreno Attorney: John Vincent Hogan, IV

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/16/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Defendant and Appellant: Ford Models, Inc., a New York CorporationAttorney: Matthew X. Oster Attorney: Michael Alexander Sigall Defendant: Jordan DonerAttorney: Cassandra J. Zappaterreno Attorney: John Vincent Hogan, IV

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Appeal filed on February 28, 2022 by Ford Models, Inc.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCV01747; Trial Court Judge: Karlan, Craig

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less