This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/17/2023 at 06:52:18 (UTC).

Doe v. Commission on Professional Competence

Case Summary

On 10/03/2022 Doe filed an Other lawsuit against Commission on Professional Competence. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 5 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Strobel, Mary. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3923

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Strobel, Mary

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Jane Doe

Respondents and Defendants

Commission on Professional Competence

Torrance Unified School District

Respondent and Interested Party

Torrance Unified School District

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Carlos Roberto Perez

Alejandra Gonzalez-Bedoy

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

R Matthew Wise

Robert Andres Bonta

Paul Evan Stein

Sean Clinton Woods

Sarita Thakor Patel

Spencer E. Covert

Michael Terrence Travis

Respondent and Interested Party Attorneys

Sarita Thakor Patel

Spencer E. Covert

Michael Terrence Travis

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/16/2023
  • HearingDescription: Appellant's opening brief.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/17/2023
  • DocketDescription: Email received from:; Notes: mediator P. Cook, informing this Court that the matter has settled. Counsel to file a request for dismissal of the appeal.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/10/2023
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed to:; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 06/16/2023 By 60 Day(s)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Settlement conference scheduled for:; Notes: March 28, 2023 at 10:00 a.m.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.; Notes: TWO: Clerks (371 Pages), ONE: reporter.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/06/2023
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Notice dated Nov. 18, 2022: 8.122 w. RT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Settlement conference requested by:; Notes: Appellant[Request for mediation]

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Jane Doe Attorney: Carlos Roberto Perez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketBrief: Appellant's opening brief.; Due Date: 06/16/2023; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Jane DoeAttorney: Alejandra Gonzalez-Bedoy Attorney: Carlos Roberto Perez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/31/2022
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Jane DoeAttorney: Carlos Roberto Perez

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: R342967 Civil Filing Fee paid $775.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee waiver.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Notice of appeal filed on October 03, 2022 by Jane Doe.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/02/2022
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: 21STCP03457; Trial Court Judge: Strobel, Mary

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less