This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 06/24/2022 at 00:24:24 (UTC).

Doe et al. v. Massage Envy Franchising, LLC et al.

Case Summary

On 07/19/2021 Doe filed an Other lawsuit against Massage Envy Franchising, LLC. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, First Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Weiner, Marie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***3543

  • Filing Date:

    07/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Weiner, Marie

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Jane Doe

Defendants and Respondents

Massage Envy Franchising, LLC

Me Time, Inc.

ACKC, Inc.

New Genovation, LLC

OC Spa Group, Inc.

OC Health Group, Onc.

Me Cotati, Inc.

Stafford-Sebastian Ventures, LLC

Angeline Sebastian-Stafford

Marina Clinic Development, Inc.

WMC Development, Inc.

Coastal Massage Channel Island Harbor, LLC

RME Clinics Inc.

KRG Consulting Inc.

Ascension Ventures, Inc.

Hau'Oli 'Ohana Oi, LLC

Eight Hands Four Hearts, Inc.

Jackal Nandan, Inc.

Desert Ventures South, LLC

24 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Stewart Ryan

Attorney at Laffey, Bucci & Kent, LLP

1100 Ludlow Street Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Brian T, Kent

Attorney at Laffey, Bucci & Kent, LLP

1100 Ludlow Street Suite 300

Philadelphia, PA 19107

Kristen Annie Vierhaus

Attorney at Thompson Law Offices PC

700 Airport Blvd Ste 160

Burlingame, CA 94010

Jessica A. Dayton

Attorney at ADZ Law, LLP

2000 Alameda De Las Pulgas, Suite 161

San Mateo, CA 94403

Robert William Thompson

Attorney at Thompson Law Offices, P.C.

700 Airport Blvd Ste 160

Burlingame, CA 94010-1931

Defendant and Respondent Attorneys

Jeffrey Brennan Gurrola

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

50 California Street, Suite 1500

San Francisco, CA 94111

Luanne Sacks

Attorney at Sacks Law Office

170 Larkspur Landing Circle, Suite 199

Larkspur, CA 94939

Robert B. Bader

Attorney at Sacks, Ricketts & Case LLP

177 Post Street, Suite 650

San Francisco, CA 94108

Jacqueline Rubin

Attorney at Paul Weiss

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Robert Atkins

Attorney at Paul Weiss

1285 Avenue Of The Americas

New York, NY 10019

Laurie J. Hepler

Attorney at Greines, Martin, Stein & Richland LLP

50 California Street, Suite 1500

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michele D. Floyd

Attorney at Sacks, Ricketts & Case

177 Post Street - Suite 650

San Francisco, CA 94108

B. Thomas French

Attorney at Hassard Bonnington

275 Battery St., Suite 1800

San Francisco, CA 94111

Abraham M. Andrade

Attorney at Murphy, Pearson, Bradley & Feeney

580 California St Ste 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104-1032

Erik S. Faussner

Attorney at Hassard Bonnington LLP

275 Battery St Ste 1600

San Francisco, CA 94111-3370

Dexter B. Louie

Attorney at Hassard Bonnington LLP

275 Battery Street, Suite 1600

San Francisco, CA 94111

Michael Patrick Bradley

Attorney at Murphy Pearson Bradley & Feeney

580 California Street Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Jonathan M. Blute

Attorney at Murphy, Pearson, Bradley & Feeney

580 California Street, Suite 1100

San Francisco, CA 94104

Juliet M. Lompa

Attorney at Stone & Associates APC

2125 Ygnacio Valley Rd, Suite 101

Walnut Creek, CA 94598

Eileen J. Gaisford

Attorney at Bremer, Whyte, Brown & O'Meara

21215 Burbank Blvd Ste 500

Woodland Hills, CA 91367-7092

18 More Attorneys Available

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/21/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2022
  • HearingDescription: Respondent's brief.

    Read MoreRead Less
48 More Docket Entries
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketDescription: Email received from:; Notes: Dep. Co. Clerk R. Brown, re: clearing up labeling issue with the court reporter and I should be able to send it off ASAP.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record preparation inquiry sent.; Notes: via email re status of RTs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Appellants hereby associate Valerie T. McGinty as counsel for appellants.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Jane Doe Attorney: Stewart Ryan Valerie McGinty, attorney for appellants, w/copies of judgments attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Jane DoeAttorney: Stewart Ryan; Notes: Valerie McGinty, attorney for appellants, w/copies of judgments attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notified parties of local rules and procedures.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: check 3265; Thompson Law Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: 18 lower court cases appealed in one NOA by stipulation, appealing orders of 5/21/21 and 6/14/21: 1. 19CIV00392 Jane Doe #3 (D.B) 2. 19CIV00392A Jane Doe #37 (M.S.) and #38 (E.L.) 3. 19CIV00392B Jane Doe #28( A.L.) 4. 19CIV00392C Jane Doe #25 (M.H.) and #33 (A.M.) 5. 19CIV00392D Jane Doe #21 (S.H.) 6. 19CIV00392G Jane Doe #30 (M.M.) 7. 19CIV00392H Jane Doe #23 (A.H.) 8. 19CIV00392I Jane Doe #27 (R.L.) 9. 19CIV04095 Jane Doe #3 (E.J) 10. 19CIV04095C Jane Doe #4 (D.T.) 11. 19CIV05035 Jane Doe #18 (L.N.) and #19 (M.M.) 12. 19CIV05035B Jane Doe #10 (E.D) 13. 19CIV05035D Jane Doe #12 (A.H.) and #16 (T.R.) 14. 19CIV05035E Jane Doe #9 (J.C.) 15. 19CIV05035G Jane Doe #11 (T.S.) 16. 19CIV05035H Jane Doe #13 (S.L.) 17. 19CIV05035I Jane Doe #15 (J.M.) 18. 19CIV06168 Jane Doe (sole plaintiff) Stipulation/order filed 5/19/21 re non-moving defendants also attached

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Mateo County Superior Court - Main (Redwood City); County: San Mateo; Trial Court Case Number: 19CIV00392

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: San Mateo County Superior Court - Main (Redwood City); County: San Mateo; Trial Court Case Number: 19CIV05035; Trial Court Name: San Mateo County Superior Court - Main (Redwood City); County: San Mateo; Trial Court Case Number: 19CIV00392; Trial Court Judge: Weiner, Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Coastal Massage Channel Island Harbor, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where OC Health Group, Onc. is a litigant