This case was last updated from California Courts Of Appeal on 02/24/2021 at 10:49:37 (UTC).

Doan v. Tran

Case Summary

On 08/13/2020 Doan filed an Other lawsuit against Tran. This case was filed in California Courts Of Appeal, Fifth Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***1544

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff and Respondent

Richard Doan

Defendant and Appellant

Deanna Tran

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff and Respondent Attorneys

Kevin Campbell Findley

Attorney at Klein DeNatale Goldner Cooper Rosenlieb & Kimball LLP

4550 California Ave, 2Nd Floor

Bakersfield, CA 93309

Kurt David Van Sciver

Attorney at Van Sciver Law

5500 Ming Ave, Suite 254

Bakersfield, CA 93309-4625

Catherine E. Bennett

Attorney at Klein, DeNatale, Goldner, Cooper, Rosenlieb & Kimball LLP

4550 California Avenue, 2Nd Floor

Bakersfield, CA 93309

Defendant and Appellant Attorneys

Hila Golchet

Attorney at Keystone Law Group, PC

11300 W. Olympic Blvd, Suite 910

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Shawn S. Kerendian

Attorney at Keystone Law Group, P.C.

11300 W Olympic Blvd Ste 910

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1646

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 04/09/2021 By 63 Day(s) (2nd request)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2021
  • DocketDescription: Requested - extension of time; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Requested for 04/09/2021 By 63 Day(s) (2nd request)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2020
  • DocketDescription: Stipulation of extension of time filed:; Notes: Appellant's opening brief. Due on 02/05/2021 By 60 Day(s) (1st stipulation/request)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent advising record on appeal has been filed.; Notes: All counsel re AOB due in 40 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed proof of service.; Notes: Certificate of Mailing and Receipt for Record on Appeal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2020
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: 3V/747 pages

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Notice to Parties re Fees on Appeal; filed 9/22/2020 for CTX.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/15/2020
  • DocketDescription: Respondent 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: 9/14/2020; additional documents for CTX and copy of RTX.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Clerk's Affidavit filed 9/11/2020 re: the record on appeal will proceed by way of Clerk's Transcript as designated by Appellant's Designation filed 9/3/2020.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: All Counsel and Superior Court re: The Court has determined that the above entitled appeal is not suitable for mediation. Pursuant to Court of Appeal, Fifth District, Local Rules, rule 2 (Mediation in Civil Appeals), the suspension of the operation of California Rules of Court, rules 8.121, 8.124, and 8.216 requiring designation of the record on appeal, payment of the estimated costs of preparation of the record on appeal, and submission of a proposed briefing schedule is terminated as of this date. You are directed to comply immediately with the applicable California Rules of Court as if the notice of appeal was filed as of the date of this letter.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2020
  • DocketDescription: Respondent's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Bennett obo Respondent Doan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketDescription: Appellant's Questionnaire received.; Notes: Atty Golchet obo Applt Tran

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filed letter from:; Notes: Atty Catherine Bennett jointly represents Respondent Doan and will be the lead attorney; request to be added to notifications filed 8/18/20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: credit card by phone from Rebecca at Keystone Law for applt. Tran

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to:; Notes: the parties and Superior Court notifying that the mediation questionnaires are due within 10 days.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: Atty Golchet obo Applt Tran

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: on 8/14/20 Superior Court sent to Atty Golchet obo Appt Tran re failure to pot the required deposit.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2020
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: Atty Golchet obo Applt Tran appeals from 6/19/20 order.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2020
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Kern County Superior Court - Main; County: Kern; Trial Court Case Number: BPB-18-003282

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer GOLCHET HILA

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KERENDIAN SHAWN S.