This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/15/2023 at 02:11:09 (UTC).

D.M. v. The Superior Court; DPSS

Case Summary

On 01/26/2023 D M filed an Other lawsuit against The Superior Court DPSS. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Cho, Susanne. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***0618

  • Filing Date:

    01/26/2023

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Cho, Susanne

 

Party Details

Petitioner

D. M.

Respondent

The Superior Court of Riverside County

Interested Party

Riverside County Department of Public Social Services

Not Yet Classified

L. M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Kevin Kar Shek

Attorney at Juvenile Defense Panel

P.O. Box 5643

La Quinta, CA 92248-5643

Interested Party Attorney

Office of the County Counsel

3960 Orange St., Fifth Floor

Riverside, CA 92501-3674

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Cynthia Angela Lugo

Attorney at Law Office of Cynthia A. Lugo

Po Box 5608

La Quinta, CA 92248-5608

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/08/2023
  • DispositionDescription: Order dismissing petition; Disposition Type: Final

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case in basement storage.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: Dismissal order filed.; Notes: Pursuant to letter filed Mar 8, 2023, by counsel for petitioner D.M., petition is dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/08/2023
  • DocketDescription: No Issue Statement Filed by Counsel; Notes: Dtd Mar 8, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/27/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Motion for relief and petition shall be filed within 10 days, or case will be dismissed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Letter sent to counsel re:; Notes: Record has been filed on this date. Writ petition is due within 10 days.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Juvenile writ record filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Reporter's transcript filed.; Notes: R-2 (139 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2023
  • DocketDescription: Clerk's transcript filed.; Notes: C-3 (851 pgs)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: County clerk extension granted.; Notes: to Feb 14, 2023 to submit record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of; Notes: Minute Order dtd Jan 17, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Notice to reporter to prepare transcript.; Notes: dtd Jan 31, 2023

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2023
  • DocketDescription: Received notice of intent.; Notes: dtd Jan 26, 2023; D.M. (Father)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2023
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: INJ2100025; Trial Court Judge: Cho, Susanne

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less