This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 04/02/2022 at 19:55:01 (UTC).

Disi v. Tanoura et al.

Case Summary

On 04/23/2021 Disi filed an Other lawsuit against Tanoura. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Hill, Deirdre. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2308

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Hill, Deirdre

 

Party Details

Appellant and Plaintiff

Rochel Disi

Respondents and Defendants

Merit Medical Systems, Inc.

Merit Bioacquisition Co.

Harbor/UCLA Medical Center

Biosphere Medical, Inc.

Regents of the University of California

Tad Tanoura

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Appellant and Plaintiff Attorneys

Vanessa Lorraine Loftus-Brewer

Attorney at Balaban & Spielberger

11999 San Vicente Blvd Ste 345

Los Angeles, CA 90049-5073

Shea Sierra Murphy

Attorney at Esner Chang & Boyer

234 E. Colorado Blvd., Suite 975

Pasadena, CA 91101

Daniel Keith Balaban

Attorney at Balaban and Spielberger

11999 San Vicente Blvd. Suite 345

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Holly Noelle Boyer

Attorney at Esner Chang & Boyer

234 East Colorado Blvd., Suite 975

Pasadena, CA 91101

Andrew J. Spielberger

Attorney at Balaban & Spielberger, LLP

11999 San Vicente Blvd. Suite 345

Los Angeles, CA 90049

Respondent and Defendant Attorneys

Tiffany Baci Hunter

Attorney at Clark Hill LLP

1055 W 7Th St Ste 2400

Los Angeles, CA 90017-2550

Daniel P. Barer

Attorney at Pollak Vida & Barer

11500 West Olympic Blvd. Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90064-1525

Kelly Lynn Kiseskey

Attorney at Law Offices of David J. Weiss

11340 W. Olympic Blvd. Suite 100

Los Angeles, CA 90064

David J. Weiss

Attorney at David Weiss Law

11340 West Olympic Blvd. Suite 100

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Anna L. Birenbaum

Attorney at Pollak, Vida & Barer

11150 W. Olympic Blvd. Suite 400

Los Angeles, CA 90064

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Association of attorneys filed for:; Notes: Attorneys Shea Murphy and Holly Boyer of Esner, Chang & Boyer are associated in as co-counsel of record for appellant, Disi.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • HearingDescription: Record on appeal filed.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Filing Fee Paid for: Appeal filed 4/23/21 Labeled "R"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filing fee.; Notes: $775 Filing Fee Paid for: Appeal filed 4/23/21 Labeled "Appeal 1"

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Rochel Disi Attorney: Daniel Keith Balaban

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketDescription: Civil case information statement filed.; Notes: Plaintiff and Appellant: Rochel Disi Attorney: Daniel Keith Balaban R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Rochel DisiAttorney: Daniel Keith Balaban

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketBrief: Civil case information statement filed.; Party Attorney: Plaintiff and Appellant: Rochel DisiAttorney: Daniel Keith Balaban; Notes: R

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice per rule 8.124 - with reporter's transcript.; Notes: Notice dated May 5, 2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd - (R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: April 23, 2021: Rochel Disi - (R)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent-appellant notified per rule 8.100(c).; Notes: No fee rcvd

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/13/2021
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: April 23, 2021: Rochel Disi

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Los Angeles County Superior Court; County: Los Angeles; Trial Court Case Number: BC707011; Trial Court Judge: Hill, Deirdre

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HARBOR-UCLA MEDICAL CENTER is a litigant

Latest cases where THE REGENTS OF THE UNIVERSITY OF CALIFORNIA A PUBLIC ENTITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Merit Medical Systems, Inc. is a litigant