This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 06/30/2022 at 22:02:33 (UTC).

DIGNITY COMMUNITY CARE v. S.C. (ZOLNIERKIEWICZ)

Case Summary

On 05/12/2022 DIGNITY COMMUNITY CARE filed an Other lawsuit against C ZOLNIERKIEWICZ. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4541

  • Filing Date:

    05/12/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Dignity Community Care

Respondent

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Interested Party

Iwona Zolnierkiewicz

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Jeffry A. Miller

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

550 West C Street Suite 1700

San Diego, CA 92101

Wendy Sabina Dowse

Attorney at Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP

74-830 Highway 111, Suite 200

Indian Wells, CA 92210-7101

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorneys

Arthur Sezgin

Attorney at Sezgin Khousadian LLP

500 North Central Avenue, Suite 830

Glendale, CA 91203-3587

Alisa Khousadian

Attorney at Sezgin Khousadian LLP

500 North Central Avenue, Suite 830

Glendale, CA 91203-3587

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/15/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review denied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Record requested; Notes: Court of Appeal record was imported and is available in electronic format.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/12/2022
  • DocketDescription: Petition for review filed; Notes: Petitioner: Dignity Community Care Attorney: Jeffry A. Miller Attorney: Wendy Sabina Dowse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • DocketCourt of Appeal District/Division: Second Appellate District , Div. 2; Court of Appeal Case Number: B319399; Disposition: Petition summarily denied by order; Trial Court: Los Angeles County Superior Court; Trial Court Case Number: 20GDCV00693

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DIGNITY COMMUNITY CARE is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer KHOUSADIAN ALISA