This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 03/09/2022 at 21:39:10 (UTC).

Diaz et al. v. Superior Court of Los Angeles County et al.

Case Summary

On 08/04/2021 Diaz filed an Other lawsuit against Superior Court of Los Angeles County. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Second Appellate District - Division 4 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Alarcon, Gregory. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***4002

  • Filing Date:

    08/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Alarcon, Gregory

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Jose S. Diaz

Maria Elena Diaz

Respondents

Superior Court of Los Angeles County

Hon. Gregory Wilson Alarcon

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Parties

Rehabbers Financial, Inc.

Joel D Hoffman

Carrel Hoffman

Melanie Doe

DOES 1 through 20, inclusive

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Russell Mackay Frandsen

Attorney at The Business Legal Group

680 East Colorado Suite 180

Pasadena, CA 91101

Respondent Attorney

Frederick Bennett

Attorney at Superior Court of Los Angeles County

111 North Hill Street, Room 546

Los Angeles, CA 90012

Interested Party Attorney

Bruce Barclay Paller

Attorney at Law Ofices of Bruce B. Paller

3639 E. Harbor Blvd. Suite 112

Ventura, CA 93001-4276

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/01/2021
  • DispositionDescription: Petition summarily denied by order; Disposition Type: Final The petition for writ of mandate filed on August 5, 2021, has been read and considered. The petition is denied as untimely. Petitioners contest the trial court's April 20, 2021 order denying their motion for leave to amend their complaint, an order that was signed, filed and served more than three and a half months before filing this petition. (Cal West Nurseries v. Superior Court (2005) 129 Cal.App.4th 1170, 1173 [writ petitions generally should be filed within 60 days].)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Case complete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/01/2021
  • DocketDescription: Order denying petition filed.; Notes: The petition for writ of mandate filed on August 5, 2021, has been read and considered. The petition is denied as untimely. Petitioners contest the trial court's April 20, 2021 order denying their motion for leave to amend their complaint, an order that was signed, filed and served more than three and a half months before filing this petition. (Cal West Nurseries v. Superior Court (2005) 129 Cal.App.4th 1170, 1173 [writ petitions generally should be filed within 60 days].)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate. (Corrected with Page Numbers)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/04/2021
  • DocketDescription: Filed petition for writ of:; Notes: Mandate. ***Exhibits Attached***

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where REHABBERS FINANCIAL INC. DBA AZTEC FINANCIAL A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases where Superior Court of Los Angeles County is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PALLER BRUCE B