This case was last updated from California Supreme Court on 01/26/2023 at 06:03:29 (UTC).

DEVEREUX ON DISCIPLINE

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 DEVEREUX ON DISCIPLINE was filed as a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit. This case was filed in California Supreme Court, California Supreme Court located in Statewide, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***2041

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Michael Sean Devereux

Beverly Hills, CA 90210-5536

Respondent

State Bar of California

180 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Michael Sean Devereux

Attorney at Wexford Law

9171 Wilshire Boulevard Suite 500

Beverly Hills, CA 90210-5536

Respondent Attorneys

Office of General Counsel - State Bar

180 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Office of the State Bar Court

Attorney at Attn: Tammy Cleaver, Court Services Analyst

845 South Figueroa Street

Los Angeles, CA 90017

State Bar of California/Membership

180 Howard Street

San Francisco, CA 94105

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/10/2022
  • DocketDescription: Returned record

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Recommended discipline imposed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/14/2022
  • DocketDescription: Recommended discipline imposed; Notes: The court orders that Michael Sean Devereux (Respondent), State Bar Number 225240, is suspended from the practice of law in California for one year, execution of that period of suspension is stayed, and Respondent is placed on probation for one year subject to the following conditions: 1. Respondent is suspended from the practice of law for the first 60 days of probation; 2. Respondent must comply with the other conditions of probation recommended by the Hearing Department of the State Bar Court in its Decision filed on October 21, 2021; and 3. At the expiration of the period of probation, if Respondent has complied with all conditions of probation, the period of stayed suspension will be satisfied and that suspension will be terminated. Costs are awarded to the State Bar in accordance with Business and Professions Code section 6086.10 and are enforceable both as provided in Business and Professions Code section 6140.7 and as a money judgment, and may be collected by the State Bar through any means permitted by law.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • DocketDescription: Time for filing petition for review expired

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketDescription: Record of State Bar discipline filed

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less