This case was last updated from California Courts of Appeal on 05/25/2022 at 00:30:34 (UTC).

Deutsche Bank Trust Company v. Thomas Tarbutton

Case Summary

On 01/03/2022 Deutsche Bank Trust Company filed an Other lawsuit against Thomas Tarbutton. This case was filed in California Courts of Appeal, Fourth Appellate District - Division 2 located in Statewide, California. The Judge overseeing this case is Bermudez, Angel. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ***8324

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Statewide, California

Judge Details

Trial Court Judge

Bermudez, Angel

 

Party Details

Respondent and Plaintiff

Deutsche Bank Trust Company

Defendant and Appellant

Thomas Tarbutton

Represa, CA 95671

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent and Plaintiff Attorneys

Jesse S. Hernandez

707 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Vanessa Hindley Widener

Attorney at Anderson, McPharlin & Connors, LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3623

Ali Zamin Vaqar

Attorney at Anderson, McPharlin & Conners LLP

707 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 4000

Los Angeles, CA 90017-3623

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/19/2022
  • HearingDescription: Remittitur issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed by motion; Disposition Type: Final

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2022
  • DocketDescription: Dismissed by motion; Notes: Respondent's Mar 22, 2022, motion is granted. Appeal is dismissed because appellant lacks standing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • DocketDescription: To court.; Notes: respondent's motion to dismiss / motion to reconsider order vacating dismissal and appellant's opposition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2022
  • DocketDescription: Opposition filed.; Notes: to respondent's Motion to dismiss / Motion to Reconsider Order Vacating Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • DocketDescription: Granted - extension of time.; Notes: By court order. Appellant's request for an extension of time to file opposition to respondent's motion to dismiss on or before April 21, 2022, is granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appellant 's notice designating record on appeal filed in trial court on:; Notes: Apr 6, 2022, per order of Mar 10, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of county clerk filed.; Notes: Appellant's designation of record was filed after all.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Certificate of county clerk filed.; Notes: Pursuant to the order filed by your court on Mar 10, 2022, appellant was to serve and file a notice designating the record on appeal on or before Mar 30, 2022. Appellant has failed to file said notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received copy of document filed in trial court; Notes: Appellant's letter dtd Apr 6, 2022, with designation of record attached

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 02/09/2022
  • DispositionDescription: Dismissed per rule 8.140(b); Disposition Type: Vacated

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2022
  • DocketDescription: Appeal dismissed per rule 8.140(b).; Notes: Vacated, per order of Mar 10, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: To presiding justice for signature.; Notes: Proposed dismissal order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice received-appellant notified per rule 8.140(a)(1).; Notes: Feb 7, 2022; Designations

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketDescription: Received default notice 8.121(a) designation not filed. Dated:; Notes: Jan 14, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • DocketDescription: Default notice sent; no case information statement filed, or statement incomplete.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketDescription: Order waiving filing fee.; Notes: appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Application for waiver of filing fee filed.; Notes: appellant

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketDescription: Notice of appeal lodged/received.; Notes: dtd Jan 3, 2022; Thomas Tarbutton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketTrial Court Name: Riverside County Superior Court; County: Riverside; Trial Court Case Number: MCC2000881; Trial Court Judge: Bermudez, Angel

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Deutsche Bank Trust Co is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer VAQAR ALI ZAMIN

Latest cases represented by Lawyer HERNANDEZ JESSE S.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WIDENER VANESSA H.